Witherspoon v. City Of Waukegan

Case Number: 1:2006cv07089
Filed: December 22, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2012 212 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/22/2012. Mailed notice(cjg, )
March 30, 2011 205 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/30/2011. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 23, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant City Of Waukegan for judgment Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Plaintiff's Retaliation Claim (Peracke, Nicole)
June 29, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant City Of Waukegan for judgment [CORRECTED DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON PLAINTIFF'S RETALIATION CLAIM] (Stephenson, Karen)
June 24, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant City Of Waukegan for judgment memorandum of law in support of defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law on plaintiff's race discrimination claim (Stephenson, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witherspoon v. City Of Waukegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?