Leo Stoller vs. Google Inc Featured Case

Leo Stoller appealed three orders issued by the Bankruptcy Court: an order denying a motion to dismiss, another order denying a motion to stay, and an order denying a motion for leave to object to the claims.

Creditor: Pure Fishing, Inc.
Appellant: Leo Stoller
Appellee: Google Inc
Case Number: 1:2007cv00092
Filed: January 8, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: William J. Hibbler
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2007 24 MINUTE entry before Judge William J. Hibbler: This case is dismissed without prejudice pending resolution of the August 23, 2007 ruling issued by the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit in 07-1569, 07-1612, 07-1651, precluding Appellant from filing any documents until payment of sanctions. All pending dates and motions are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (jdh)
September 24, 2007 23 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge William J. Hibbler held on 7/9/07 (Volumes 1). (gcy, )
August 31, 2007 22 LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 07-2637. To be returned at a later date. (gcy, )
August 31, 2007 21 MANDATE of USCA dated 8/20/07 regarding notice of appeal 13 ; This cause, docketed on 7/13/07, is dismissed for failure to timely pay the required docketing fee, pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b); USCA No. 07-2537. (gcy, )
July 31, 2007 20 USCA RECEIVED on 7/31/07 the long record regarding notice of appeal 13 (cdh, )
July 31, 2007 19 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 13 (USCA no. 07-2637) consisting of one volume of pleadings and one loose document. (cdh, )
July 13, 2007 18 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Notice. (gcy, )
July 13, 2007 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record by 7th Circuit. USCA 07-2637. (gcy, )
July 13, 2007 16 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 13 . Notified counsel (cdh, )
July 10, 2007 15 DESIGNATION by Leo Stoller of the content of the record on appeal (cdh, )
July 10, 2007 14 DOCKETING Statement and issues on appeal by Leo Stoller regarding notice of appeal 13 (cdh, )
July 10, 2007 13 NOTICE of appeal by Leo Stoller regarding orders 9 , 12 ; Notice of filing (FEE DUE). (cdh, )
July 9, 2007 12 MINUTE entry before Judge William J. Hibbler : For the reasons set forth below, Debtor/Appellee's Motion to Reconsider (doc. # 10) is Denied. Additionally, Stoller has failed to seek leave from the Executive Committee prior to the filing of his current appeals as ordered in that Committee's March 8, 2007 Order. This Court orders that Stoller act in accordance with the Executive Committee's Order forthwith or he may be subject to appropriate sanctions. Notices distributed in open court (gcy, )
June 28, 2007 11 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stoller for presentment of motion for reconsideration 10 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 7/9/2007 at 09:30 a.m.(gcy, )
June 28, 2007 10 MOTION by Appellant Leo Stoller for reconsideration. (gcy, )
June 20, 2007 9 MINUTE entry before Judge William J. Hibbler : For the reasons set forth below, this Court will issue a ruling on the instant appeal upon the conclusion of Stroller's bankruptcy proceedings in 05BK64075. Further, in the interest of judicial economy and to deter the numerous seemingly frivolous filing from Stroller, will order that Stoller is enjoined from filing appeals from bankruptcy proceeding 05 BK64075 until the conclusion of those proceedings.Mailed notice (mjc, )
May 15, 2007 8 ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY In Support of Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis by Leo Stoller. (gcy, )
January 25, 2007 7 SUPPLEMENTAL to the Record on Appeal from USBC/ND IL. (gcy, )
January 17, 2007 6 DESIGNATION of Additional Items for Record on Appeal by Google Inc. (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED). (gcy, )
January 17, 2007 5 NOTICE by Pure Fishing, Inc. of Statement and Reservation of Rights of Pure Fishing, Inc. in Lieu of Counter-Designation of Additional Items for Record on Appeal (Factor, William)
January 17, 2007 4 NOTICE by Richard M. Fogel, not individually, but as chapter 7 trustee for the estate of Leo Stoller (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Alwin, Janice)
January 8, 2007 3 ONE VOLUME OF MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENTS. (05BK64075). (gcy, )
January 8, 2007 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) . Modified on 3/13/2007 (gcy, ).
January 8, 2007 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 05BK64075 consisting of Transmittal letter, Notice of Appeal, Certified Copy of Docket #1 thru 251. (Judge Schmetterer) (gcy, Modified on 3/13/2007 (gcy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leo Stoller vs. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Pure Fishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leo Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?