Wilkes v. Chisox Corp. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes
Defendant: CWS Maintenance Co. and Chicago White Sox, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2007cv00249
Filed: January 16, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2008 30 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber :Status hearing held. Cause dismissed without prejudice. Cause may be dismissed with prejudice by 3/27/2008. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (wp, )
February 19, 2008 29 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber : Status hearing reset for 2/27/2008 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
January 22, 2008 28 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber :Status hearing held on 1/22/2008. Status hearing set for 2/21/2008 at 09:00 AM. Discovery cut-off date extended to 2/22/2008.Mailed notice (wp, )
October 23, 2007 27 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber : Status hearing held on 10/23/2007 and continued to 1/22/2008 at 9:00a.m.Mailed notice (slb, )
August 22, 2007 26 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber :Status hearing held and continued for 10/23/2007 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
June 19, 2007 25 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Chicago White Sox, Ltd, CWS Maintenance Co.(Convery, James)
June 7, 2007 24 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber :Status hearing held and continued for 8/22/2007 at 09:00 AM. Defendants' to answer amended complaint by 6/21/2007.Mailed notice (wp, )
May 25, 2007 23 AMENDED complaint by Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes against all defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Charges of Discrimination# 2 Exhibit Charges of Discrimination# 3 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue# 4 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue)(Enright, Thomas)
May 8, 2007 22 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber : Status hearing held and continued for 6/7/07 at 9:00 a.m. Defendants' motion to dismiss 19 is granted. Plaintiff granted leave to file amended complaint by 5/25/07. Mailed notice (vkd, )
April 25, 2007 21 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber :Defendants' motion to dismiss 19 is entered and continued for 5/8/2007 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (wp, )
March 30, 2007 20 NOTICE of Motion by James J. Convery for presentment of motion to dismiss 19 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/25/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Convery, James)
March 30, 2007 19 MOTION by Defendants Chisox Corp., Chicago White Sox, Ltd, CWS Maintenance Co. to dismiss (Convery, James)
March 30, 2007 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Chisox Corp., Chicago White Sox, Ltd, CWS Maintenance Co.(Convery, James)
March 30, 2007 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chisox Corp., Chicago White Sox, Ltd, CWS Maintenance Co. by James J. Convery (Convery, James)
March 29, 2007 16 MINUTE entry before Judge Harry D. Leinenweber : Status hearing set for 5/8/2007 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
March 12, 2007 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Chicago White Sox, Ltd., waiver sent 2/1/07. (vkd, )
March 12, 2007 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to ChiSox Corp., waiver sent 2/1/07. (vkd, )
March 12, 2007 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to CWS Maintenance Co. waiver sent 2/1/07. (vkd, )
March 9, 2007 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes. Chisox Corp. waiver sent on 3/1/2007, answer due 4/30/2007. (Enright, Thomas)
March 9, 2007 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes. Chicago White Sox, Ltd waiver sent on 3/5/2007, answer due 5/4/2007. (Enright, Thomas)
March 9, 2007 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes. CWS Maintenance Co. waiver sent on 3/1/2007, answer due 4/30/2007. (Enright, Thomas)
February 1, 2007 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons. (vkd, )
February 1, 2007 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes by Thomas Michael Enright. (vkd, )
February 1, 2007 7 NOTICE of Correction regarding attorney appearance 4 . (vkd, )
January 31, 2007 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to E. Ramsey Gordon on 2-1-07 by Plaintiff Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes. Waiver of service due by 3/5/2007. (Enright, Thomas)
January 31, 2007 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Gerald Penner on 2-1-07 by Plaintiff Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes. Waiver of service due by 3/5/2007. (Enright, Thomas)
January 31, 2007 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes by Thomas Michael Enright (Enright, Thomas) (Incorrect document linked).
January 16, 2007 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (vkd, )
January 16, 2007 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes; Jury Demand; (Exhibits).(vkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkes v. Chisox Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWS Maintenance Co.
Represented By: James J. Convery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago White Sox, Ltd
Represented By: James J. Convery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy (Bechtel) Wilkes
Represented By: Thomas Michael Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?