Timebase Pty Ltd. v. The Thomson Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Timebase Pty Ltd.
Defendant: Thomson Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2007cv00460
Filed: January 24, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: George W. Lindberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2007 25 Featured Case RETURN of U.S. Post Office receipt, article no. 7006 0100 0001 7313 0247, received on 3/28/07. (smm)
April 3, 2007 24 Featured Case ACKNOWLEDGMENT of record transferred to Minneapolis, MN, case number 07 CV 1687 JNE/JJG, received on 3/28/07. (smm)
March 26, 2007 23 Featured Case TRANSFERRED to the District of Minnesota the electronic case file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet via certified mail number 7006 0100 0001 7313 0247 (hp, )
March 9, 2007 Featured Case MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA with certified copy of minute order dated 03/09/2007. (hp, )
March 9, 2007 19 Featured Case ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by Judge George W. Lindberg on 3/9/2007:Mailed notice(hp, )
March 9, 2007 18 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge George W. Lindberg on 3/9/2007:Mailed notice(hp, )
March 9, 2007 17 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Defendant's motion to transfer venue to the District of Minnesota 10 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (hp, )
March 5, 2007 16 Featured Case REPLY by Defendant Thomson Corporation, The to motion to transfer case, 10 Reply in Support of Defendant Thomson Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Andrew Martens# 2 Certificate of Service)(Irwin, Barry)
February 26, 2007 15 Featured Case RESPONSE by Plaintiff Timebase Pty Ltd. to motion to transfer case, 10 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Hosteny, Joseph)
February 21, 2007 14 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Timebase Pty Ltd. regarding Alias Summons and Complaint served on The Thomson Corporation on January 30, 2007 (Hosteny, Joseph)
February 15, 2007 22 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Thomson Corporation by Chad M. Drown; Order entered granting leave by Judge George W. Lindberg. Filing fee $ 50.00 paid, receipt number 1113512. (vkd, ) Modified on 4/23/2007 (vcf, ).
February 15, 2007 21 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomson Corporation, The by Calvin L Litsey; Order entered granting leave by Judge George W. Lindberg. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 1113512. (mjc, )
February 15, 2007 20 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomson Corporation, The by David J.F. Gross; Order entered granting leave by Judge George W. Lindberg. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 1113512. (mjc, ) Modified on 4/18/2007 (vcf, ).
February 13, 2007 13 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Timebase Pty Ltd. by Arthur Anthony Gasey (for Eric J. Mersmann) (Gasey, Arthur)
February 13, 2007 12 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge George W. Lindberg : Defendant's motion to transfer venue to the district of Minnesota and for a more definite statement 10 is entered and continued. Plaintiff's written response to the motion is due 2/26/07. Reply due 3/5/07. In court ruling on 4/4/07 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 2/14/07 at 9:30 a.mMailed notice (slb, )
February 9, 2007 11 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Barry F. Irwin for presentment of motion to transfer case, 10 before Honorable George W. Lindberg on 2/14/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Irwin, Barry)
February 9, 2007 10 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Thomson Corporation, The to transfer case to the District of Minnesota and for a More Definite Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D# 2 Exhibit E-H# 3 Exhibit I# 4 Declaration Chad Drown# 5 Declaration Andrew Martens# 6 Certificate of Service)(Irwin, Barry)
February 9, 2007 9 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Thomson Corporation, The by Barry F. Irwin (Irwin, Barry)
January 25, 2007 8 Featured Case ALIAS Summons and 1 copy Issued as to Thomson Corporation, The. (vmj, )
January 25, 2007 7 Featured Case MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (td, )
January 24, 2007 6 Featured Case LOCAL Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patent. (td, )
January 24, 2007 5 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Thomson Corporation.(td, )
January 24, 2007 3 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Timebase Pty Ltd. by Arthur Anthony Gasey, Joseph Nevi Hosteny, III. (td, )
January 24, 2007 2 Featured Case CIVIL Cover Sheet. (td, )
January 24, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT filed by Timebase Pty Ltd.; Jury Demand.(td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timebase Pty Ltd. v. The Thomson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Corporation, The
Represented By: David J.F. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timebase Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Arthur Anthony Gasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?