Spark Network Services, Inc. v. Match.Com, LP et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. alleged that defendants Match.com, LP, eHarmony.com, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,272,467 B1 entitled "System for Data Collection and Matching Compatible Profiles."

Plaintiff: Spark Network Services, Inc.
Defendant: Match.Com, LP, eHarmony. Com., Inc., Yahoo!, Inc., Various, Inc., True Beginnings, LLC, Perfect Match LLC, Plentyoffish Media, Inc. and Spark Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00570
Filed: January 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2010 Filing 148 MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter Stipulated Order of Dismissal. All claims, defenses and counterclaims that were brought between Plaintiff and each of the Defendants, Match.com, LP, eHarmony.com, In., Various, Inc., TrueBeginnings, LLC, Perfect Match LLC and/or Spark Networks, Inc. in this civil action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Civil case terminated. Civil case terminated. (For further detail see separate order(s).) Mailed notice (ep, )
March 25, 2010 Filing 148 MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter Stipulated Order of Dismissal. All claims, defenses and counterclaims that were brought between Plaintiff and each of the Defendants, Match.com, LP, eHarmony.com, In., Various, Inc., TrueBeginnings, LLC, Perfect Match LLC and/or Spark Networks, Inc. in this civil action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Civil case terminated. Civil case terminated. (For further detail see separate order(s).) Mailed notice (ep, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/24/2010. (ep, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/24/2010. (ep, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 147 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr for presentment of motion for order, #146 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/7/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Niro, Raymond)
March 22, 2010 Filing 147 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr for presentment of motion for order, 146 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/7/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Niro, Raymond)
March 22, 2010 Filing 146 MOTION by Defendants Match.Com, LP, Perfect Match LLC, Spark Networks, Inc., True Beginnings, LLC, Various, Inc., eHarmony. Com., Inc., Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. for order entering stipulated order of dismissal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Niro, Raymond)
March 22, 2010 Filing 146 MOTION by Defendants Match.Com, LP, Perfect Match LLC, Spark Networks, Inc., True Beginnings, LLC, Various, Inc., eHarmony. Com., Inc., Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. for order entering stipulated order of dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Niro, Raymond)
July 7, 2008 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: This order is entered to clarify the docket. Defendant Plentyoffish Media, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 110 is denied as moot because plaintiff voluntarily dismissed Plentyoffish Media, Inc. from the case without prejudice on March 6, 2008. The court granted defendants Match.Com LP and eHarmony.com's Motion To Stay Litigation on February 21, 2008. Defendant Various, Inc's motion to join the motion to stay 125 is granted nunc pro tunc. Mailed notice (kj, )
July 7, 2008 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: This order is entered to clarify the docket. Defendant Plentyoffish Media, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #110 is denied as moot because plaintiff voluntarily dismissed Plentyoffish Media, Inc. from the case without prejudice on March 6, 2008. The court granted defendants Match.Com LP and eHarmony.com's Motion To Stay Litigation on February 21, 2008. Defendant Various, Inc's motion to join the motion to stay #125 is granted nunc pro tunc. Mailed notice (kj, )
May 29, 2008 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 8/7/2007, 1/8/2008; Before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan, (144-1 through 144-2) (Document not scanned) (td, )
May 13, 2008 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 10/10/2007; Before the Honorable Honorable Nan R. Nolan. (Document not scanned) (td, )
March 6, 2008 Filing 142 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall : Pursuant to Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Plentyoffish Media, Inc. #138 filed 2/21/2008, Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc hereby voluntarily dismisses without prejudice its complaint against Defendant Plentyoffish Media, Inc. No rights are waived or voluntarily dismissed as to any other Defendant. No appearance required on 3/6/2008. Plentyoffish Media, Inc. terminated.Mailed notice (rbf, )
February 28, 2008 Filing 140 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall : Motion by Vedder Price P.C. to withdraw appearance and to correct the record #135 is granted. The docket to reflect that Robert S. Riggs appearance is filed on behalf of Perfect Match and not Spark Network Services.Mailed notice (rbf, )
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Match.Com, LP by Fernando Rodriguez, Jr; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10974012. (rbf, )
February 21, 2008 Filing 139 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall : Motion hearing held. Status hearing is set for 3/6/2008 at 9:30AM as to Plaintiff and Defendant, Plentyoffish Media, Inc. Motion by Defendants Match.Com LP, eHarmony.Com., Inc to stay litigation pending disposition of reexamination of the patent-in-suit #99 is granted. Motion by Defendant True Beginnings, LLC to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) is withdrawn without prejudice. May refile motion at conclusion of reexamination proceedings. This case is stayed and answers to complaint pending disposition of reexamination of the patent-in-suit. Mailed notice (lcw, )
February 21, 2008 Filing 138 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plentyoffish Media, Inc., Spark Network Services, Inc. (Niro, Raymond)
February 21, 2008 Filing 137 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan : District court has granted stay of case pending patent office granting defendants' motion to re-examin patent. Referral is closed as this time. Judge Nan R. Nolan no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 18, 2008 Filing 136 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Stephen Rigg for presentment of motion to withdraw, motion to amend/correct #135 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/28/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Rigg, Robert)
February 18, 2008 Filing 135 MOTION by Defendant Perfect Match LLC to withdraw Appearance, MOTION by Defendant Perfect Match LLC to amend/correct The Record (Rigg, Robert)
February 13, 2008 Filing 134 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Perfect Match LLC by Robert Stephen Rigg (Rigg, Robert)
February 11, 2008 Filing 133 ATTORNEY Appearance for Spark Network Services, Inc. by Robert Rigg. (Rigg, Robert) Modified on 2/12/2008 (rbf, ).
February 6, 2008 Filing 132 ATTORNEY Appearance for Various, Inc. by Ira P Rothken. (gmr, )
February 6, 2008 Filing 131 NOTICE OF PATENT OFFICE GRANT OF REQUEST FOR REEXAMINATION OF THE PATENT-IN-SUIT by Match.Com, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Varga, Craig)
February 5, 2008 Filing 129 ANSWER to counterclaim of Various, Inc. by Spark Network Services, Inc.(Niro, Raymond)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Spark Network Services, Inc., Spark Networks, Inc. by Dalila Argaez Wendlandt; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 106 51564. (jmp, )
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Various, Inc. by Ira P Rothken; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10913524 (rbf, )
January 25, 2008 Filing 126 ANSWER to amended complaint by Spark Networks, Inc.(Mandell, Steven)
January 24, 2008 Filing 127 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall :Briefing schedule as to Plentyoffish Media's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative for failure to state a claim 110]is as follows : Responses due by 4/1/2008. Replies due by 4/14/2008. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 22, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION by Defendant Various, Inc., Counter Claimant Various, Inc. for joinder in Motion to Stay Litigation (Flaming, Todd)
January 22, 2008 Filing 124 ANSWER to amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Various, Inc. against Spark Network Services, Inc.. by Various, Inc.(Flaming, Todd)
January 22, 2008 Filing 123 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Various, Inc. (Flaming, Todd)
January 22, 2008 Filing 122 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Various, Inc. by Todd H. Flaming (Flaming, Todd)
January 22, 2008 Filing 121 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Various, Inc. by Lesley Gayle Smith (Smith, Lesley)
January 17, 2008 Filing 118 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall :Motion hearing held on 1/17/2008. Motion Hearing re: motion to dismiss,,, #102 , motion to stay #99 continued to 2/21/2008 at 09:15 AM. Jurisdictional discovery as to Plentyoffish Media Inc. motion to dismiss #110 is ordered closed 3/17/08. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 16, 2008 Filing 120 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant True Beginnings, LLC by Casey L Griffith (rbf, )
January 16, 2008 Filing 119 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant True Beginnings, LLC by David W Carstens (rbf, )
January 16, 2008 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Nan R. Nolan held on 5/17/07 (Volumes 1). (Document not imaged) (rbf, )
January 15, 2008 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Nan R. Nolan held on 11/7/07 (Volumes 1). (Document not imaged). (rbf, )
January 15, 2008 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM by Plentyoffish Media, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #110 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Markus Frind)(Hall, Christopher)
January 15, 2008 Filing 111 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher S. Hall for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #110 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/24/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Hall, Christopher)
January 15, 2008 Filing 110 MOTION by Defendant Plentyoffish Media, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Hall, Christopher)
January 15, 2008 Filing 109 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Plentyoffish Media, Inc. by Christopher S. Hall (Hall, Christopher)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of True Beginnings, LLC by Casey L Griffith; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10913366 (rbf, )
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of True Beginnings, LLC by David W Carstens; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10913366. (rbf, )
January 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Spark Networks, Inc. by Laurence S. Rogers; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10913404. (rbf, )
January 9, 2008 Filing 108 ANSWER to counterclaim of Match.com re Amended Complaint by Spark Network Services, Inc.(Niro, Raymond)
January 8, 2008 Filing 107 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 1/8/2008 and continued to 2/21/2008 at 09:30 AM. Oral motion by defendant True Beginnings, LLC to proceed pro hac vice is granted. Discovery is stayed until 02/21/08 pending the patent review.Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 8, 2008 Filing 106 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spark Networks, Inc. by Keith E Allen (Allen, Keith)
January 8, 2008 Filing 105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spark Networks, Inc. by Stephen J. Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
January 8, 2008 Filing 104 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spark Networks, Inc. by Steven P. Mandell (Mandell, Steven)
January 7, 2008 Filing 103 NOTICE of Motion by Sharyn Marie Castle for presentment of motion to dismiss,,, #102 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/17/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Castle, Sharyn)
January 7, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION by Defendant True Beginnings, LLC to dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(3) (Attachments: #1 Appendix MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS#2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Siulte Decl.)#3 Exhibit Ex. A (1 of2)(Siulte Decl.)#4 Exhibit Ex. A (2 of 2)(Siulte Decl.)#5 Exhibit B (Siulte Decl.)#6 Exhibit Ex. C (Siulte Decl.)#7 Exhibit D (Siulte Decl.)#8 Exhibit Ex. E (Siulte Decl.)#9 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Herb Vest Decl.)#10 Exhibit Ex. A (1 of 7)(Vest Decl.)#11 Exhibit Ex. A (2 of 7)(Vest Decl.)#12 Exhibit Ex. A (3 of 7)(Vest Decl.)#13 Exhibit Ex. A (4 of7)(Vest Decl.)#14 Exhibit Ex. A (5 of 7)(Vest Decl.)#15 Exhibit Ex. A(6 of7)(Vest Decl.)#16 Exhibit Ex. A(7 of 7)(Vest Decl.))(Castle, Sharyn)
January 7, 2008 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM by Match.Com, LP, eHarmony. Com., Inc. in support of motion to stay #99 litigation pending disposition of reexamination of the patent-in-suit (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. KACSMARYK)(Carlson, Larry)
January 7, 2008 Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by Larry D. Carlson for presentment of motion to stay #99 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/17/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Carlson, Larry)
January 7, 2008 Filing 99 MOTION by Defendants Match.Com, LP, eHarmony. Com., Inc. to stay litigation pending disposition of reexamination of the patent-in-suit (Carlson, Larry)
January 4, 2008 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 10/25/2007; Before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan. (Document not scanned) (rp, )
January 3, 2008 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall :Unopposed Motion by True Beginnings LLC for an extension of time nunc pro tunc, to January 7, 2008 to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint #92 is granted. Unopposed Motion by Defendant, Spark Network, Inc for enlargement of time within which to answer or otherwise plead by January 25, 2008 #94 is granted. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Match.Com, LP by Matthew Joseph Kacsmaryk; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10342722. (rbf, )
December 26, 2007 Filing 95 NOTICE of Motion by Keith E Allen for presentment of extension of time #94 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/3/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Allen, Keith)
December 26, 2007 Filing 94 MOTION by defendant Spark Network Inc. for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Keith) Modified on 1/8/2008 (rbf, ).
December 26, 2007 Filing 93 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Adam Dorfman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #92 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/3/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Dorfman, Michael)
December 26, 2007 Filing 92 MOTION by Defendant True Beginnings, LLC for extension of time to file response/reply as to amended complaint #77 (Unopposed) (Dorfman, Michael)
December 26, 2007 Filing 91 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. by Keith E Allen (Allen, Keith)
December 26, 2007 Filing 90 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant True Beginnings, LLC by Sharyn Marie Castle (Castle, Sharyn)
December 26, 2007 Filing 89 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. by Stephen J. Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
December 26, 2007 Filing 88 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. by Steven P. Mandell (Mandell, Steven)
December 26, 2007 Filing 87 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant True Beginnings, LLC by Timothy J. Vezeau (Vezeau, Timothy)
December 26, 2007 Filing 86 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant True Beginnings, LLC by Michael Adam Dorfman (Dorfman, Michael)
December 21, 2007 Filing 85 DEFENDANT MATCH.COM, L.P.'S ANSWER to amended complaint, JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Match.Com, LP against Spark Network Services, Inc.. by Match.Com, LP(Varga, Craig)
December 14, 2007 Filing 83 STIPULATION That eHarmony.Com's Original Answer Shall Serve As eHarmony.Com's Answer to Spark Network Services' Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hult, Matthew)
December 13, 2007 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall : Motion by Defendant, eHarmony.com to withdraw the appearance of Amy L. Beckman as counsel for defendant #79 is granted. Motion by John Nickelson to withdraw as counsel for Defendant, Match.com #74 is granted.Attorney Amy L. Beckman and John C. Nickelson terminated.Mailed notice (rbf, )
December 10, 2007 Filing 82 ATTORNEY Appearance for eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Richard S. Swope (rbf, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Richard S. Swope; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10912919. (rbf, )
December 7, 2007 Filing 80 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer M Kurcz for presentment of motion to withdraw #79 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/13/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Kurcz, Jennifer)
December 7, 2007 Filing 79 MOTION by Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. to withdraw Amy L. Beckman as Counsel (Kurcz, Jennifer)
December 4, 2007 Filing 78 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Various, Inc., True Beginnings, LLC, Perfect Match LLC, Plentyoffish Media, Inc. (rbf, )
December 4, 2007 Filing 77 AMENDED complaint by Spark Network Services, Inc. against Match.Com, LP, eHarmony. Com., Inc. and terminating Yahoo!, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc.; Yahoo!, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc. (Vickrey, Paul)
December 4, 2007 Filing 76 NOTICE by Spark Network Services, Inc. Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint (Vickrey, Paul)
December 4, 2007 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by John C. Nickelson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #74 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/13/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Nickelson, John)
December 4, 2007 Filing 74 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Match.Com, LP to withdraw as attorney (Nickelson, John)
November 15, 2007 Filing 73 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Defendant Spark Network Services, Inc. by Eric Jonathan Mersmann (Mersmann, Eric)
November 7, 2007 Filing 72 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Minute order entry #71 is amended to include the following: All production of documents out-lined in open Court to completed by 01/15/08. Joint status report out-lining any unresolved discovery issues to be filed with chambers no later than 01/04/08.Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 7, 2007 Filing 71 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 11/7/2007 and continued to 1/8/2008 at 09:30 AM. The Court hereby adopts parties joint discovery schedule out-lined in the Second Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report #68 .Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 5, 2007 Filing 68 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Spark Network Services, Inc. (Vickrey, Paul)
November 1, 2007 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Nan R. Nolan held on 9/20/07 (Volume 1). (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED). (rbf, )
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal Signed by Judge Joan B. Gottschall on 10/30/2007.(rbf, )
October 30, 2007 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall : Agreed motion for entry of stipulation and order of dismissal between Spark and Yahoo #62 is granted. Enter Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. It is hereby ordered that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(I)(ii) of the FRCP, all claims, defenses and/or counterclaims that were or could have been made by and between Spark Network Services, Inc. and defendant, Yahoo!, Inc. relating to this civil action are dismissed with prejudice. Spark and Yahoo shall each bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This court retains jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement between them relating to this civil action or any action relating to the enforcement of this Order.Mailed notice (rbf, )
October 25, 2007 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Status hearing held and continued to 11/07/07 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are directed to meet and confer to attempt any resolution regarding the out-standing discovery issues discussed in open court. Counsel to file in chambers by 11/05/07, a status report out-lining any unresolved discovery issues.Mailed notice (lxs, )
October 24, 2007 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Case set for telephonic status hearing for 10/25/07 at 4:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide a telephone where counsel can be reached.Mailed notice (lxs, )
October 23, 2007 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 8/22/07; Before the Honorable Nan R. Nolan. (Document Not Scanned) (lcw, )
October 23, 2007 Filing 63 Notice of Agreed Motion NOTICE of Motion by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr for presentment of motion for order, #62 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/1/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Niro, Raymond)
October 23, 2007 Filing 62 MOTION by Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc., Defendant Yahoo!, Inc. for order entering Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with respect to Defendant Yahoo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal#2 Certificate of Service)(Niro, Raymond)
October 10, 2007 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 10/10/2007 and continued to 10/25/2007 at 04:30 PM.Mailed notice (lxs, )
October 5, 2007 Filing 60 STATUS Report for 10/10/07 hearing by Spark Network Services, Inc., Match.Com, LP, eHarmony. Com., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Niro, Raymond)
September 20, 2007 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 9/20/2007 and continued to 10/10/2007 at 10:15 AM. Counsel are directed to meet and confer and attempt to resolve the issues out-lined in open court. Counsel to file with this chambers by 10/05/2007 a status report regarding the meet and confer.Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 18, 2007 Filing 58 STATUS Report by Match.Com, LP (Varga, Craig)
August 22, 2007 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Status hearing held on 08/22/2007 outlining 4 remaining issues regarding protective order. Parties agreed as to issues 3 & 4 as out-lined in open Court. Counsel are directed to meet and confer to make an attempt to resolve issues 1 & 2 of the protective order. Counsel are directed to file with this chambers by 09/18/2007 a status report regarding the meet and confer. A copy of the protective order to be e-mailed to the following address: www.margaret_lipman@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 09/20/07 at 10:30 a.m. Out-of-town counsel are given leave to participate telephonically. Counsel to contact Judge Nolan's courtroom deputy with contact number at (312) 435-5833, one day prior to the status.Mailed notice (lxs, )
August 7, 2007 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 8/7/2007 and continued to 8/22/2007 at 09:30 AM. Parties are to file a status report by 08/21/07 regarding the discovery issues discussed in open court. Out-of-town counsel are granted leave to participate telephonically. Counsel should provide this Court a direct dial number where the Court can initiate the status call.Mailed notice (lxs, )
July 5, 2007 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant, Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Sugithra Somasekar (rbf, )
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Amy L. Beckman; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10723538. (rbf, )
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Sugithra Somasekar; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10648422. (rbf, )
June 29, 2007 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Amy L. Beckman. (rbf, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 5/17/2007 and continued to 8/7/2007 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (lxs, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 50 AMENDED report of rule 26(f) planning meeting #46 by Spark Network Services, Inc., Match.Com, LP, eHarmony. Com., Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. (Joint) (Varga, Craig)
May 4, 2007 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before Judge Nan R. Nolan :Initial status hearing set for 5/17/2007 at 09:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Nolan in courtroom 1858. Parties shall deliver a copy of an initial status report to chambers, room 1870, at least three business days before the initial status hearing. If the parties have recently prepared and filed an initial status report, the submission of the previously filed initial status report is sufficient. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Nolans standing order setting agreed scheduling order. Copies are available through Judge Nolans web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.Mailed notice (lxs, )
May 2, 2007 Filing 48 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Nan R. Nolan for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference.(rj, )Mailed notice.
May 2, 2007 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall : Status hearing held on 5/2/2007. This is referred to Magistrate Judge Nolan for discovery supervision and settlement conference. Mailed notice (rj, )
April 27, 2007 Filing 46 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Spark Network Services, Inc. (Laney, Frederick)
April 19, 2007 Filing 44 SPARK NETWORKS SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER to counterclaim OF DEFENDANT, MATCH.COM by Spark Network Services, Inc.(Vickrey, Paul)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Robert E. Freitas; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10722213 (mb, )
April 12, 2007 Filing 42 Spark Networks Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to counterclaim of Defendant, Yahoo by Spark Network Services, Inc.(Vickrey, Paul)
April 12, 2007 Filing 41 Spark Network's Services, Inc's. ANSWER to counterclaim of Defendant, eHarmony by Spark Network Services, Inc.(Vickrey, Paul)
April 11, 2007 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant/Counter Claimant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Robert E. Freitas. (ar, )
March 30, 2007 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Match.Com, LP against Spark Network Services, Inc.. by Match.Com, LP(Varga, Craig)
March 28, 2007 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall :Status hearing held on 3/28/2007. Status hearing set for 5/2/2007 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be exchanged by 4/18/2007.Mailed notice (rj, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Matthew J. Hult. (vkd, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Matthew J. Hult; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50.00 paid, receipt number 10647068. (vkd, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Chester Day. (vkd, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Chester Day; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50.00 paid, receipt number 10647068. (vkd, )
March 26, 2007 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Chris R. Ottenweller. (vkd, )
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Chris R. Ottenweller; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50.00 paid, receipt number 10647068. (vkd, )
March 23, 2007 Filing 27 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Yahoo!, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(White, Jason)
March 23, 2007 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Yahoo!, Inc. against Spark Network Services, Inc.. by Yahoo!, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(White, Jason)
March 23, 2007 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Leif R. Sigmond, Jr (Sigmond, Leif)
March 23, 2007 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant eHarmony. Com., Inc., Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by S. Richard Carden (Carden, S.)
March 23, 2007 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by eHarmony. Com., Inc. (Kurcz, Jennifer)
March 23, 2007 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by eHarmony. Com., Inc. against Spark Network Services, Inc.. by eHarmony. Com., Inc.(Kurcz, Jennifer)
March 23, 2007 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant eHarmony. Com., Inc. by Jennifer M Kurcz (Kurcz, Jennifer)
March 22, 2007 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall :Agreed motion by Defendant, Match.Com's for extension of time to file responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint by 4/1/2007 #18 is granted.Mailed notice (rj, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Match.Com, LP by John C. Nickelson; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10721901 (mb, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Match.Com, LP by Larry D. Carlson; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10721898 (mb, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Match.Com, LP by Chad C. Walters; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10721900 (mb, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Match.Com, LP by Kevin J. Meek; Order entered granting leave by Judge Joan B. Gottschall. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10721899 (mb, )
March 19, 2007 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Match.Com, LP Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Barry, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2007 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Barry for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/22/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Barry, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2007 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Match.Com, LP for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (AGREED) (Barry, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2007 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Match.Com, LP by Elizabeth Barry (Barry, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2007 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Match.Com, LP by Craig Allen Varga (Varga, Craig)
February 26, 2007 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yahoo!, Inc. by William H. Frankel (Frankel, William)
February 26, 2007 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yahoo!, Inc. by Stephanie Joy Felicetty (Felicetty, Stephanie)
February 26, 2007 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before Judge Joan B. Gottschall : MOTION by Defendant Yahoo!, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead by 3/23/2007 #11 is granted. No appearance is required on 3/1/2007. Status hearing set for 3/28/2007 at 09:30 AM. Parties are directed to discuss settlement of case, consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge and a proposed discovery plan. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 22, 2007 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Jason C. White for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/1/2007 at 09:30 AM. (White, Jason)
February 22, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Yahoo!, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (White, Jason)
February 22, 2007 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yahoo!, Inc. by Jason C. White (White, Jason)
January 31, 2007 Filing 9 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (gej,)
January 30, 2007 Filing 8 LOCAL RULE 3.4 notice of Claims involving patent by Spark Network Services, Inc. (gej, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Match.Com, LP, eHarmony. Com., Inc., Yahoo!, Inc. (gej, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. by Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr. (gej, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. by Paul K. Vickrey. (gej, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Spark Network Services, Inc. by Frederick Christopher Laney. (gej, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (gej, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Spark Network Services, Inc.; (Exhibits) Jury Demand.(gej, )
January 30, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Spark Network Services, Inc.; (Exhibits) Jury Demand.(gej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spark Network Services, Inc. v. Match.Com, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spark Network Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul K Vickrey
Represented By: Frederick Christopher Laney
Represented By: Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Stephan Rigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match.Com, LP
Represented By: Craig Allen Varga
Represented By: Chad C. Walters
Represented By: Elizabeth Barry
Represented By: Fernando Rodriguez, Jr.
Represented By: John C. Nickelson
Represented By: Kevin J. Meek
Represented By: Larry D. Carlson
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Kacsmaryk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eHarmony. Com., Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Beckman
Represented By: Chester Day
Represented By: Chris R. Ottenweller
Represented By: Jennifer M Kurcz
Represented By: Leif R. Sigmond, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Hult
Represented By: Richard S. Swope
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: S. Richard Carden
Represented By: Sugithra Somasekar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. White
Represented By: William H. Frankel
Represented By: Stephanie Joy Felicetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various, Inc.
Represented By: Ira P Rothken
Represented By: Lesley Gayle Smith
Represented By: Todd H. Flaming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Beginnings, LLC
Represented By: Casey L Griffith
Represented By: David W Carstens
Represented By: Michael Adam Dorfman
Represented By: Sharyn Marie Castle
Represented By: Timothy J. Vezeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Match LLC
Represented By: Robert Stephan Rigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plentyoffish Media, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spark Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Steven P. Mandell
Represented By: Dalila Argaez Wendlandt
Represented By: Keith E Allen
Represented By: Laurence S. Rogers
Represented By: Stephen J. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?