Chicago Board Options Exchange, Incorporated v. International Securities Exchange, LLC

Plaintiff: Chicago Board Options Exchange, Incorporated
Defendant: International Securities Exchange, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00623
Filed: January 31, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 758 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/10/2014: CBOE's motion for the award of attorney's fees and related non-taxable expenses 751 is granted in part and denied in part. CBOE shall submit a detailed request for the fees incurred as a direct result of ISEs conduct identified in this Opinion and Order. The parties are directed to work together to determine fees in accordance with Northern District of Illinois Local Rule 54.3(d).Mailed notice(mad, )
January 14, 2014 737 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order regarding Bill of Costs Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/14/2014. CBOE's bill of costs will be awarded in an amount to be determined after CBOE submits additional materials as set forth in this Opinion and Order. CBOE is to submit its costs for depositions minus expedited costs and the entire invoice that is Exhibit 13 to Docket Entry 733 by January 31, 2014. Mailed notice(mad, )
January 14, 2013 643 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/14/2013: Order entered 1/10/2013 (#642) is stricken. ISEs motion to reconsider (#456) is granted in part and denied in part as stated herein. See statement section of this order for details. [ For further details see written opinion.] Notices mailed by Judicial staff. Modified on 1/14/2013 (ac, )
March 2, 2011 363 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 3/2/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago Board Options Exchange, Incorporated v. International Securities Exchange, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Board Options Exchange, Incorporated
Represented By: Jordan Adam Newmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Securities Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Michael Denny Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?