Hernandez et al v. Cook County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Ivan Hernandez, Roberto Rodriguez, Bill Jones, Gene Michno, Marvin Bailey and Richard Davis
Defendant: Cook County Sheriff's Office, Michael F Sheahan, Timothy Kaufmann, Scott Kurtovich, Dennis Andrews, Thomas Snooks and County Of Cook
Case Number: 1:2007cv00855
Filed: February 13, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2015 520 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment 485 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/16/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )
September 10, 2015 519 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for summary judgment 482 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/10/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 18, 2014 470 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss 452 , is denied. Status hearing held on 12/18/2014. Plaintiff's motion to supplement 468 , is granted. Defendant's answer to count V is due on or before 12/29/14. Status hearing set for 1/23/2015 at 09:00 AM. No appearance required on the notice motion date of 12/22/14. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/18/2014:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 31, 2014 445 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order:For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment 396 is denied. A status hearing is set for 8/6/2014 at 09:00 a.m., at which time the parties should be prepared to schedule a prompt trial to resolve this case that is more than seven years old. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/31/2014:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 7, 2013 395 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to vacate is granted in part in that the Court vacates its order dismissing Plaintiffs' 1983 claims against the Sheriff's Office and claim for intentional inf liction of emotional distress against all Defendants, and denied in part in that the court does not vacate its order dismissing Plaintiffs' claim for false imprisonment. 372 If Defendants intend to move for summary judgment on the remaining cl aims, Defendants must do so by November 6, 2013. Defendants' Motion for bill of costs 377 and Motion for attorney fees 381 are dismissed without prejudice. Case reopened. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/7/2013:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 30, 2012 331 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/30/2012. Mailed notice(cjg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Cook County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Hernandez
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Rodriguez
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Jones
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Michno
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Bailey
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Davis
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F Sheahan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Kaufmann
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kurtovich
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Andrews
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Snooks
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?