United States of America v. Schaudt et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: William E Schaudt, Robert F Schaudt, Joann Schaudt, Countrywide Bank, N.A., Illinois Department of Employement Security, Illinois Department of Revenue and William G. Schaudt & Evelyn M. Schaudt Family Trust
Cross Claimant: Countrywide Bank, N.A.
Cross Defendant: Joann Schaudt
Case Number: 1:2007cv00895
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2010 212 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 2/8/2010.(smm)
September 29, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 9/29/2009.Mailed notice(vcf, )
April 30, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 4/30/2009.(vcf, )
January 21, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 1/21/2009.(vcf, )
October 8, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 10/8/2008.(vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schaudt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E Schaudt
Represented By: Herman Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Schaudt
Represented By: Herman Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Schaudt
Represented By: Herman Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marc S. Lipinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Employement Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Schaudt & Evelyn M. Schaudt Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Countrywide Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marc S. Lipinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Joann Schaudt
Represented By: Herman Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?