Thayer v. Chiczewski et al
Plaintiff: Andy Thayer
Defendant: Ralph Chiczewski, Unknown Police Officers and Employees of the City of Chicago and City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2007cv01290
Filed: March 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/4/2010.(jj, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 3/31/2010. (ep, )
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 9/11/2009. (ep, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/20/2009. (ep, )
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 4/30/2009. (ep, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thayer v. Chiczewski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Chiczewski
Represented By: Andrew S. Mine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Police Officers and Employees of the City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Andrew S. Mine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Thayer
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?