BCS Services, Inc. v. Heartwood 88, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: BCS Services, Inc. and Phoenix Bond & Indemnity, Co.
Defendant: Richarony, LLC, Anthony DeLaurentis, Richard Turner, Bamp, LLC, Heartwood 88, Inc., Sass Muni-IV, LLC, Sass Muni-V, LLC, SALTA Group, Inc., Marshall Atlas, HBZ, Inc., Lori Levinson, Judith Berger, Wheeler-Dealer, Ltd., B G Investments, Inc., Bonnie J. Gray and Timothy E. Gray
Movant: Sabre Group LLC, John Bridge and Barrett Rochman
Case Number: 1:2007cv01367
Filed: March 9, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James B. Moran
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2012 999 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/22/2012. (mk)
December 21, 2012 997 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/21/2012. (mk)
December 7, 2012 994 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding petitions for attorney's fees and costs, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/7/2012. The case is set for a status hearing on 12/20/2012 at 9:30 a.m. as more fully described in this decision. (mk)
September 5, 2012 942 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/5/12: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendants' motions for judgment as a matter of law and for a new trial. The Sass defendants' motion to stay was previously ruled upon and is therefore terminated. (mk)
January 31, 2012 940 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/31/12. (mk)
January 24, 2012 935 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/24/12. (mk)
September 1, 2010 821 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 9/1/2010. (kj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BCS Services, Inc. v. Heartwood 88, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richarony, LLC
Represented By: Elisha S. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeLaurentis
Represented By: Elisha S. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Turner
Represented By: Elisha S. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bamp, LLC
Represented By: Elisha S. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartwood 88, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kenneth Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sass Muni-IV, LLC
Represented By: Brandon L Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sass Muni-V, LLC
Represented By: Brandon L Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALTA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Monkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Atlas
Represented By: Elizabeth Monkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBZ, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Levinson
Represented By: Michael D. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Berger
Represented By: Michael D. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler-Dealer, Ltd.
Represented By: William Thomas Huyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B G Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Michael Widman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie J. Gray
Represented By: Stuart Michael Widman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy E. Gray
Represented By: William Thomas Huyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCS Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lowell E. Sachnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Bond & Indemnity, Co.
Represented By: Lowell E. Sachnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Sabre Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: John Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Barrett Rochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?