Majerczyk v. Menu Foods, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Dawn Majerczyk, Raymond Demith and Heather Amro
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Acquisition Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund and Menu Foods Operating Trust
Movant: Shirley Sexton
Case Number: 1:2007cv01543
Filed: March 20, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2007 55 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of record transferred to the USDC-District of New Jersey (07cv3296) received on 7/16/2007. (gej, )
July 12, 2007 54 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of New Jersey the original electronic file, certified copy of MDL transfer order, and docket sheet via certified mail number 7706 0100 0001 7312 7988. (gej, )
July 11, 2007 52 MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen :Pursuant to the transfer order [48-2], this case is transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, to the Honorable Noel L. Hillman in the District of New Jersey. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gej, )
July 11, 2007 51 MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen :Defendant's motion to reassign case 49 as related is granted pursuant to the order entered on 6/8/2007. Plaintiff's motion 19 to reassign case 7 c 2162 is granted. Motions terminated: Mailed notice (tsa, )
June 29, 2007 53 CONDITIONAL Transfer Order from MDL Panel Transferring case to USDC District of New Jersey.(gej, )
June 29, 2007 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Operating Trust, Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods Acquisition Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation by William Christopher Martin (Martin, William)
June 29, 2007 49 MOTION by Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Operating Trust, Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods Acquisition Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation to reassign case (SECOND MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES) (Martin, William)
June 29, 2007 48 NOTICE by Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Operating Trust, Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods Acquisition Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation (NOTICE OF MULTIDISTRICT CONSOLIDATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407) (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Order)(Martin, William)
June 19, 2007 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. by William Christopher Martin. (gej, )
June 15, 2007 46 MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen :All cases are stayed pending MDL transfer. Status hearing set for 8/1/2007 @ 9:00 a.m. Defendant is given to file the appearance of William C. Martin. Oral motion by Edward Ruff to withdraw is granted. Draft order to follow. Mailed notice (gej, )
June 8, 2007 45 Featured Case ORDER Signed by Judge Wayne R. Andersen on 6/8/2007.(gej, )
June 8, 2007 44 MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen :Enter order regarding defendant's motion to stay all proceedings. Status hearing set for 6/15/2007 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (gej, )
May 10, 2007 39 MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen :Defendants motion to stay 35 is granted.Status hearing set for 6/21/2007 at 09:00 AM. Motion for reassignment of related case 29 is granted. Case number 07cv2211 (J. Darrah) shall be reassigned to the calender of J. Andersen.Mailed notice (gej, )
May 9, 2007 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Rottinghaus in compliance with Rule 5.2(c). (gej, )
May 7, 2007 37 LETTER from Cheryl A. Williams, Esq. dated 5/2/2007. (gej, )
May 4, 2007 43 RESPONSE by Plaintiff to Motion for Transfer and Consolidation and Request for Transfer and Consolidation of Related Actions to the Western District of Arkansas under 28 Section 1407. (gej, )
May 4, 2007 42 MEMORANDUM of Law in support of their Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Central District of California and for Consolidated or Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1407 by Plaintiffs. (gej, )
May 4, 2007 41 MOTION of Plaintiffs for Transfer of Actions to the Central District of California and for Consolidated or Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1407. (gej, )
May 4, 2007 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl A. Williams. (gej, )
May 3, 2007 36 NOTICE of Motion by Edward B. Ruff, III for presentment of motion to stay, 35 before Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 5/10/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Ruff, Edward)
May 3, 2007 35 MOTION by Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Operating Trust, Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods Acquisition Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation to stay all proceedings (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14 # 15 # 16 # 17 # 18 # 19 # 20 # 21)(Ruff, Edward)
May 2, 2007 34 SUPPLEMENT by Raymond Demith to motion for miscellaneous relief 29 Supplemental Memorandum (Schwarz, Steven)
May 1, 2007 33 MEMORANDUM by Heather Amro in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 19 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Finding of Relatedness (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Wallace, Edward)
April 26, 2007 32 MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen :Plaintiff's motions 29 , 19 for relatedness are taken under advisement. Any additional written memorandum are due by 5/3/2007.Advised in open court notice (tsa, )
April 25, 2007 31 RESPONSE by Dawn Majerczykin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Heather Amro for a Finding of Relatedness 19 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3)(DiVito, Gino)
April 25, 2007 30 NOTICE of Motion by Steven E Schwarz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 29 before Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 5/3/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Schwarz, Steven)
April 25, 2007 29 MOTION Reassignment of Related Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Demith Complaint# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Majerczyk Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - MDL Hearing Order)(Schwarz, Steven)
April 23, 2007 28 MEMORANDUM of Plaintiffs Whaley et al. in Opposition to Motions for Transfer and Consolidation of Related Actions Submitted by Plaintiffs Sexton and Troiano. (gej, )
April 23, 2007 27 DECLARATION of Bonney S. McCormack. (gej, )
April 23, 2007 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dawn Majerczyk by Gino L DiVito (DiVito, Gino)
April 20, 2007 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Operating Trust, Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods Acquisition Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation by Priya K. Jesani (Jesani, Priya)
April 20, 2007 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Operating Trust, Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods Acquisition Inc., Menu Foods Limited, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation by Michael Patrick Turiello (Turiello, Michael)
April 20, 2007 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. by Edward B. Ruff, III (Ruff, Edward)
April 19, 2007 20 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth A. Wexler for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 19 before Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 4/26/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Wexler, Kenneth)
April 19, 2007 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Heather Amro for a Finding of Relatedness (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Wexler, Kenneth)
April 19, 2007 18 Motion for a Finding of Relatedness by Heather Amro (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Wexler, Kenneth)
April 17, 2007 25 RESPONSE of Plaintiffs Jared Workman, Mark and Mona Cohen, and Peggy Schneider in Response to 3 Motions for Transfer and Centralization of all Pet Food Products Liability Litigation. (gej, )
April 17, 2007 24 MEMORANDUM of Law by Plaintiffs Jared Workman, Mark and Mona Cohen, and Peggy Schneider in Response to 3 Motions for Transfer and Coodination, and for the Transfer and Centralization of all Pet Food Products Liability Litigation in the District New Jersey. (gej, )
April 10, 2007 17 LETTER from Christine M. Fox dated 4/9/2007. (gej, )
April 6, 2007 16 JOINT MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1407 by Plaintiffs Jayme Pittsonberger, David Carter and Jim Bullock 15 . (gej, )
April 6, 2007 15 MOTION for Transfer and Coordination Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1407 by Plaintiffs Jayme Pittsonberger, David Carter and Jim Bullock. (gej,)
April 4, 2007 14 First AMENDED complaint by Dawn Majerczyk against Menu Foods, Inc. (Edelson, Jay)
April 3, 2007 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dawn Majerczyk by John Blim (Blim, John)
April 2, 2007 12 SCHEDULE of Actions Related to Plaintiffs Motion for Centralization and Coordination of Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1407; (Exhibits). (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED) (gej, )
April 2, 2007 11 MEMORANDUM of Law by Plaintiff in support of their motion for Transfer and Consolidation of Related actions to the Western District of Washington Under 28 U.S.C. section 1407; (Exhibits). (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED) (gej, )
April 2, 2007 10 CERTIFICATE of Service regarding Motion 9 . (gej, )
April 2, 2007 9 MOTION by Florida Plaintiff Christina Troiano to Transfer and Coordinate or Consolidate Actions Under 28 U.S.C. section 1407. (gej, )
April 2, 2007 8 LETTER from Steve W. Berman dated 3/28/2007. (gej, )
April 2, 2007 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs for Transfer and Consolidation of Related Actions to the Western District of Washington Under 28 U.S.C. section 1407. (gej, )
March 30, 2007 6 MOTION for Transfer and Coordination or Consolidation Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 by Shirley Sexton; (Exhibits). (gej, )
March 20, 2007 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. (gej, )
March 20, 2007 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dawn Majerczyk by Jay Edelson. (gej, )
March 20, 2007 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (gej, )
March 20, 2007 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dawn Majerczyk; Jury Demand.(gej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majerczyk v. Menu Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited Partnership
Represented By: Michael Patrick Turiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Turiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Priya K. Jesani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Acquisition Inc.
Represented By: Priya K. Jesani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Priya K. Jesani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Operating Trust
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Majerczyk
Represented By: Gino L DiVito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Demith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Amro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Shirley Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?