Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC et al v. W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC and Walter Ledergerber
Defendant: W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Counter Claimant: W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC and Walter Ledergerber
Case Number: 1:2007cv01593
Filed: March 22, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/1/2010.(tsa, )
May 12, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/12/2009:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 18, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiffs Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC, Walter Ledergerber, Counter Defendants Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC, Walter Ledergerber for judgment of Non-Infringement (Megley, Richard)
February 17, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/17/2009:Mailed notice(jms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC et al v. W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Robert A Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Ledergerber
Represented By: Kara Leta Szpondowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Hiroyuki Yasuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: John N. Scholnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ledergerber Medical Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Kara Leta Szpondowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Walter Ledergerber
Represented By: Kara Leta Szpondowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?