Mohil et al v. Glick et al

Plaintiff: Christina Mohil, Olivia Mohil, Hari Mohil and Raviraj Mohil
Defendant: Jill Glick and University of Chicago Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2007cv01600
Filed: March 22, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/18/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 14, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/14/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 1, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/1/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohil et al v. Glick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Mohil
Represented By: Merle L. Royce, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Mohil
Represented By: Merle L. Royce, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hari Mohil
Represented By: Merle L. Royce, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raviraj Mohil
Represented By: Merle L. Royce, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Glick
Represented By: Michael T. Trucco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Chicago Medical Center
Represented By: Michael T. Trucco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?