Minemyer v. R-Boc Representatives, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John T. Minemyer
Defendant: R-Boc Representatives, Inc., Dura-Line Corporation, Carolyn Lundeen, Robert Lundeen, Timothy A. Grimsley, John Doe No. 2, Precision Custom Molders, Inc., Edward Krajecki, Sandra Krajecki, LeBac Plastic Mold Co., Inc. and Ronald Backman
Counter Claimant: Precision Custom Molders, Inc., Edward Krajecki, Sandra Krajecki, R-Boc Representatives, Inc., Carolyn Lundeen, Robert Lundeen, Dura-Line Corporation, Timothy A. Grimsley, LeBac Plastic Mold Co., Inc. and Ronald Backman
Counter Defendant: John T. Minemyer
Case Number: 1:2007cv01763
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 647 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/15/2017:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 10, 2017 614 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/10/2017:Mailed notice(jms, )
June 26, 2012 523 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/26/2012:Mailed notice(jms, )
June 13, 2012 515 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/13/2012:Mailed notice(jms, )
May 11, 2012 512 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/11/2012:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 16, 2012 457 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant R-Boc Representatives, Inc. for judgment as matter of law on damages (Spears, Natalie)
February 15, 2012 456 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Ronald Backman, Dura-Line Corporation, Timothy A. Grimsley, Edward Krajecki, Sandra Krajecki, LeBac Plastic Mold Co., Inc., Carolyn Lundeen, Robert Lundeen, Precision Custom Molders, Inc., R-Boc Representatives, Inc. for judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(McAndrews, Matthew)
February 6, 2012 429 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/6/2012. (gmr, )
February 2, 2012 423 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/2/2012. (gmr, )
March 23, 2011 367 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/23/2011. (gmr, )
March 22, 2011 363 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/22/2011:Mailed notice(jms, )
September 21, 2010 320 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/21/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )
November 9, 2009 271 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/9/2009. Mailed notice(cdh, )
October 27, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 10/27/2009. Mailed notice(cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minemyer v. R-Boc Representatives, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Minemyer
Represented By: Gail Tuler Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R-Boc Representatives, Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dura-Line Corporation
Represented By: Jacque Pierre McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Lundeen
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lundeen
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Grimsley
Represented By: Jacque Pierre McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Custom Molders, Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Krajecki
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Krajecki
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeBac Plastic Mold Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Backman
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Precision Custom Molders, Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Edward Krajecki
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sandra Krajecki
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: R-Boc Representatives, Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Carolyn Lundeen
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Robert Lundeen
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Dura-Line Corporation
Represented By: Jacque Pierre McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Timothy A. Grimsley
Represented By: Jacque Pierre McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: LeBac Plastic Mold Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Ronald Backman
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John T. Minemyer
Represented By: Gail Tuler Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?