American Safety Casualty Insurance Company v. City of Waukegan, Illinois

Plaintiff: American Safety Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: City of Waukegan, Illinois
Counter Claimant: City of Waukegan, Illinois
Counter Defendant: American Safety Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv01990
Filed: April 11, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 1027 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/19/2012. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
December 20, 2011 1003 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 12/20/2011: Mailed notice. (is, )
July 29, 2011 911 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/29/2011.(tsa, )
July 6, 2011 884 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/6/2011.(tsa, )
March 3, 2011 811 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/3/2011.(tsa, )
January 19, 2011 798 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 1/19/2011: Mailed notice. (is, )
January 12, 2011 795 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/12/2011.(tsa, )
September 7, 2010 757 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 9/7/2010:Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (is, )
February 9, 2010 440 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/9/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
January 11, 2010 401 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/11/2010: Mailed notice(hp, )
March 30, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/30/2009:Mailed notice(tlp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Safety Casualty Insurance Company v. City of Waukegan, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Safety Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Winkler Cranley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waukegan, Illinois
Represented By: Darcee Corinne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: City of Waukegan, Illinois
Represented By: Darcee Corinne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: American Safety Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Scott Leo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?