Amro v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Heather Amro
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, The Proctor & Gamble Company, Chemnutra LLC, The Iams Company, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. and Chemnutra Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02162
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2007 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Wayne R. Andersen for all further proceedings in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4. Related case No. 07-1543. Signed by Judge James F. Holderman on 7/5/07. (gcy, )
June 29, 2007 19
MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen : Pursuant to the ordered entered on 6/8/7007, case number 7 c 2162 (J. Darrah) shall be reassigned to the calendar of J. Andersen as related to 7 c 1543. Mailed notices (gcy, )
May 21, 2007 16
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah :Defendants' Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead 13 14 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/19/07 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated and reset to 8/22/07 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (rp, )
May 18, 2007 14
NOTICE of Motion by Adam T Waskowski for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief13 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/23/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Waskowski, Adam)
May 17, 2007 15
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah : Status hearing set for 6/19/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notices (gcy, )
May 16, 2007 9
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Heather Amro regarding Complaint and Summons served on The Proctor & Gamble Company on 5/10/07 (Reneau, Andrae)
May 9, 2007 8
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Heather Amro regarding Summons and Complaint served on The Iams Company on 5/03/07 (Reneau, Andrae)
April 25, 2007 7
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Heather Amro by Edward Anthony Wallace (Wallace, Edward)
April 18, 2007 6
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chemnutra LLC, The Proctor & Gamble Company, The Iams Company, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Chemnutra Inc. (mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amro v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proctor & Gamble Company
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kenedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemnutra LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Iams Company
Represented By: Adam T Waskowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemnutra Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Amro
Represented By: Andrae P Reneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?