Bruski v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Gary Bruski
Defendant: Nutro Products, Inc., Menu Foods, Inc. and Petsmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02183
Filed: April 19, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2007 26
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Wayne R. Andersen for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/5/2007. Mailed Notice. (td, )
June 29, 2007 25
MINUTE entry before Judge Wayne R. Andersen : Pursuant to the order entered on 6/8/2007, case number 7 c 2183 (J. Darrah) shall be reassigned to the calendar of J. Andersen as related to 7 c 1543. Mailed notice (td, )
June 21, 2007 22
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 6/12/2007; Before the Honorable John W. Darrah. (Document not scanned) (td, )
June 12, 2007 21
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah :Status hearing held and continued to 8/28/07 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf, )
June 4, 2007 20
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah :This case being currently stayed, the Court will set the time for defendants to file responsive pleadings at the 6/12/07 status. Mailed notice(maf, )
May 15, 2007 19
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gary Bruski by George S. Bellas (Bellas, George)
May 10, 2007 18
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah : Defendants' agreed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead is granted to and including to 6/8/07 16 17. Defendants' motion to stay proceedings 14 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/12/07 at 9:00 a.m. (td, )
May 8, 2007 17
Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Bradley David Hergott for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, 16 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/15/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Hergott, Bradley)
May 3, 2007 15
NOTICE of Motion by Edward B. Ruff, III for presentment of motion to stay14 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/10/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Ruff, Edward)
April 26, 2007 13
MOTION by Defendants Petsmart, Inc., Nutro Products, Inc. for joinder of Notice of Removal [Docket No. 1] (Scandaglia, Gregory)
April 24, 2007 9
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah : Defendant's motion to correct docket and caption is granted 7. The clerk is directed to correct the docket and caption of the case to read the plaintiff's name as Gary Bruski. Mailed notice (td, )
April 23, 2007 8
NOTICE of Motion by Priya K. Jesani for presentment of motion to amend/correct7 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/1/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Jesani, Priya)
April 19, 2007 5
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. by Michael Patrick Turiello. (td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruski v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutro Products, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J. Scandaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Turiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J. Scandaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bruski
Represented By: George S. Bellas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?