Obrycka et al v. City Of Chicago et al

Plaintiff: Karolina Obrycka, Martin J Kolodziej and Eva Cepiaszuk
Defendant: City Of Chicago, Anthony Abbate, Jr, Gary Ortiz, Patti Chiriboga and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2007cv02372
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 751 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/23/2013:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 20, 2012 712 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/20/2012: The Court, in its discretion, denies the parties' joint motion to vacate the judgment 685 . The verdict and the judgment both stand. Mailed notice(kef, )
September 17, 2012 563 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/17/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 14, 2012 561 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/14/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 7, 2012 552 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/7/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 23, 2012 434 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/23/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
July 5, 2011 351 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/5/2011: The Court denies Defendant City of Chicago's Motion to Bar Lou Reiter 272 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
June 29, 2011 347 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/29/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 16, 2011 345 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/16/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 2, 2011 325 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/2/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obrycka et al v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karolina Obrycka
Represented By: Patrick Laurence Provenzale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J Kolodziej
Represented By: Patrick Laurence Provenzale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Cepiaszuk
Represented By: Patrick Laurence Provenzale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Abbate, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Chiriboga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?