William Reber, L.L.C. v. Helio L.L.C. Featured Case

Plaintiff William Reber L.L.C alleges that Defendant Helio L.L.C. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,701,258 entitled \"Wireless Pager with Prestored Images and Methods and Systems for Use thereof.\"

Plaintiff: William Reber, L.L.C.
Defendant: Helio L.L.C.
Counter Claimant: Helio L.L.C.
Counter Defendant: William Reber, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02382
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT HELIO L.L.C. Signed by Judge John W. Darrah on 10/9/2007:(gcy, )
September 4, 2007 15
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah :Status hearing held and continued to 10/4/07 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf, )
August 28, 2007 14
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah : By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 8/28/2007 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated and reset to 9/4/2007 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notices (gcy, )
July 31, 2007 13
ANSWER to counterclaim by William Reber, L.L.C.(Dossas, Vasilios)
July 20, 2007 12
ANSWER, Defenses and COUNTERClAIM to Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by Helio L.L.C. against William Reber, L.L.C..(gcy, )
July 9, 2007 11
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server filed by Plaintiff William Reber, L.L.C. regarding summons/complaint served on Helio LLC on 7/9/07. (gcy, )
June 26, 2007 10
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah :Status hearing held and continued to 8/28/07 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf, )
May 17, 2007 9
MINUTE entry before Judge John W. Darrah : Status hearing set for 6/26/07 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notices (gcy, )
May 10, 2007 8
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT by William Reber, L.L.C. of requested patent information. (mjc, )
April 30, 2007 7
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Helio L.L.C. (mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Reber, L.L.C. v. Helio L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Helio L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Reber, L.L.C.
Represented By: Vasilios D. Dossas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: William Reber, L.L.C.
Represented By: Vasilios D. Dossas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helio L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?