Elizarri v. Sheriff of Cook County et al

Plaintiff: Leoncio Elizarri
Defendant: Sheriff of Cook County and Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2007cv02427
Filed: May 2, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2016 424 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Sheriff of Cook County for judgment as a matter of law (Rule 50) (Cummings, Nicholas)
March 31, 2015 340 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/31/2015. Mailed notice(mjc, )
February 13, 2013 209 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/13/2013: The magistrate judge's ruling 202 is set aside pursuant to Fed. Rule Civ. P. 72(a). Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Electronically Store Information 195 200 is granted. [For further details see opinion.] Mailed notice.(np, )
January 24, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/24/2011: The plaintiffs' renewed motion for class certification 69 is granted. In addition, the plaintiff's motion to substitute unnamed class members for former class memb ers 92 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: the plaintiff may substitute Grzegorz Zawadowicz and Ronald Richardson as named plaintiffs in the place of Aaron Magallanes, Thomas Haugabook, and Dexter Smith, but may not substitute Kenneth Morris. The plaintiffs should comply with this court's order, (Doc. 97), directing them to file an amended complaint. A status hearing is set in this matter for February 1, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. For further details see minute order] Mailed notice (ca, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizarri v. Sheriff of Cook County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leoncio Elizarri
Represented By: Kenneth N Flaxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?