Coburn Group, LLC v. Whitecap Advisors LLC

Plaintiff: Coburn Group, LLC
Defendant: Whitecap Advisors LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv02448
Filed: May 2, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 356 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Whitecap Advisors LLC for judgment (Renewed) as Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Quantum Meruit Claim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Hultquist, Michael)
November 9, 2010 267 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/9/2010.Mailed notice.(jlj) (Main Document 267 replaced on 11/9/2010) (dl, ).
August 7, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 8/7/2009:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
January 22, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and Order Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/22/2009.(kj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coburn Group, LLC v. Whitecap Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coburn Group, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence R. Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitecap Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?