Sequel Capital, LLC v. Pearson et al

Plaintiff: Sequel Capital, LLC
Defendant: William Pearson, Anthony Graffia, Sr and Anthony Graffia, Jr
Case Number: 1:2007cv02642
Filed: May 10, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/3/2012.(mjc, )
January 19, 2012 227 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/19/2012: Before the Court are (1) Defendant Pearsons motion for extension of time 224 to file response to the motion for summary judgment 205 filed by the Graffia Defendants and Thi rd Party Defendants Hartford and Impero and (2) Plaintiffs oral motion for extension of time [see 226] to file response to the motion for summary judgment 198 filed by the Graffia Defendants. For the reasons stated below, Defendant Pearsons motion 224 is respectfully denied; Plaintiffs motion [see 226] is granted. Briefing on the Graffia Defendants motion forsummary judgment against Plaintiff 198 is extended as follows: Plaintiffs response brief is due on 2/7/2012; the Graffia Defendants reply, if any, is due on 2/21/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 21, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/21/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
July 5, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/5/2011: For the reasons below, the Court denies Third Party Plaintiffs motion to reset the briefing schedule on summary judgment 188 . Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
March 29, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/29/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff notice(tbk, )
October 13, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/13/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 30, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/30/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequel Capital, LLC v. Pearson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequel Capital, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Teplinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Graffia, Sr
Represented By: Aladar F. Siles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Graffia, Jr
Represented By: Aladar F. Siles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?