CSX Insurance Company v. Pacific Rail Services, LLC

Plaintiff: CSX Insurance Company
Defendant: Pacific Rail Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv02738
Filed: May 15, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 220 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/3/2011: CSX Insurance Co. and CSX Intermodal, Inc.'s motion for fees, nontaxable costs, and interest [191-1] is granted in part and denied in part as detailed below. The court cann ot calculate the fees and costs due,however, because of the remaining issues that shall be addressed in supplemental briefs. The court strongly urges the parties to confer in order to reach an agreed-upon award of fees, costs, and interest. In the ev ent that the parties fail to reach such an agreement, supplemental briefing shall proceed as follows: Pacific Rail's supplemental response brief shall be filed by May 31, 2011; CSX's supplemental reply brief shall be filed by June 14, 2011. The court shall rule by mail unless the parties are otherwise notified. Mailed notice. [For further detail see written opinion.] (kj, )
November 15, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/15/2010: For the reasons detailed below, CSX's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment [151-1] is granted; Pacific Rails Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment [155-1] is granted in part and denied in part; and CSXs Motion for Clarification and/or Rule 59(e) Motion for Prejudgment Interest [161-1] is granted. As a result, the court's order of February 26, 2010, is vacated in part and amended as detailed below. Additionally, Pacific Rail&# 039;s Motion for Review of Costs [174-1] is granted in part and denied in part; and CSXs Motion for Review of Costs [176-1] is granted in part and denied in part. As a result, Pacific Rail is entitled to costs in the amount of $12,867.64, while CSX is entitled to costs in the amount of $13,501.57.Mailed notice. [For further detail see minute order.](kj, )
February 26, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/26/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
May 21, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/21/2009:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Insurance Company v. Pacific Rail Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Insurance Company
Represented By: David Michael Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Rail Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?