Austin v. The County of Cook

Plaintiff: Terrence G Austin
Defendant: The County of Cook
Case Number: 1:2007cv03184
Filed: June 6, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2012 222 Opinion or Order of the Court The plaintiff's motions in limine [211-1] are granted in part and denied in part as provided herein. The defendants' motions in limine are ruled on as follows: motions (1) [202-1] and (4)[205-1] are granted. The defendants' motions in limine (2) [203-1], (3) [204-1], (5) [206-1], (6) [207-1], (7)[208-1], and (8) [209-1] are denied. WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/30/2012: Mailed notice(rth, )
November 16, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/16/2011:Mailed notice(rth, )
March 25, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 3/25/2009.(tsa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. The County of Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence G Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?