Vulcan Golf, LLC v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff sued Google and several \"parked domain\" companies for trademark infringement over the use of AdSense for Domains on websites with allegedly infringing domain names.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: Vulcan Golf, LLC, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc. and Vincent E Jackson
Defendant: Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc., Internet Reit, Inc. and John Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2007cv03371
Filed: June 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. Settlement conference remains set for 10/26/10 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall serve the settlement letter on defendant pursuant to paragraph one of this Court's standing order for settlement conference by 9/13/10. The defendant shall serve the responsive letter to the plaintiffs' settlement letter by 10/13/10. Plaintiffs' counsel shall fax or deliver copies of the letters to this Court's courtroom deputy by 10/18/10.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held and continued to 8/12/10 at 9:30 a.m. Settlement conference set for 10/26/10 at 1:30 p.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the court's direction, status hearing set for 6/18/10 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/9/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: For the reasons stated herein, Google's motion for partial summary judgment [273-1] is denied. Before setting a trial date, the court directs the parties to contact the magistrate judge's chambers to set a date for a settlement conference. Given that this ruling presumably narrows the relevant issues, the court again strongly urges the parties to attempt to resolve this matter. Enter Memorandum and Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs 323 is granted. Dana M. Pesha is given leave to withdraw on behalf of the plaintiffs. Motion hearing date of 6/11/10 is stricken. Attorney Dana Marie Pesha terminated.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Motion by Dana Marie Pesha for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 323 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/11/2010 at 09:45 AM. (Pesha, Dana)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC to withdraw as attorney (Pesha, Dana)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE by Matthew J. Herman of Change of Address (Herman, Matthew)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE by Kathleen Currie Chavez of Change of Address (Chavez, Kathleen)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE by Craig S. Mielke of Change of Address (Mielke, Craig)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE by William J. Harte of Change of Address (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harte, William)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE by Dana Marie Pesha of Change of Address (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Pesha, Dana)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. Parties advise the Court that another settlement conference would not be useful at this time. Plaintiff's counsel shall advise the Court when a ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgment is issued by the District Judge and a status hearing will be set. If the parties agree that a further settlement conference would be useful, they shall contact Judge Brown's courtroom deputy.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant's motion for leave to file corrected version of its reply memorandum of points and authorities in support for partial summary judgment 305 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 CERTIFICATE of Service by Robert M. Foote on behalf of Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC regarding sealed document, 310 , Response, 308 (Foote, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC to objections 281 (Foote, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE by Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC re sealed document, 309 , memorandum in opposition to motion 307 , sealed document, 310 , Response, 308 (Foote, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO GOOGLE'S RULE 56.1 STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Foote, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Foote, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC to Rule 56 statement 289 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Foote, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MEMORANDUM by Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC in Opposition to motion for summary judgment 273 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION (Foote, Robert)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file 305 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 1/12/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file Corrected Version of its Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support for Partial Summary Judgment (Moran, Mariah)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE by Google Inc. re exhibit 296 , Rule 56 statement 289 , declaration 290 , exhibit 300 , exhibit 294 , sealed document 288 , memorandum in support of motion 287 , exhibit 297 , exhibit 298 , declaration 291 , exhibit 301 , exhibit, 293 , sealed document 303 , sealed document 292 , exhibit 299 , reply 302 , exhibit 295 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Google's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 REPLY by Defendant Google Inc. to motion for summary judgment 273 Redacted Public Version (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Prashanth Koppula Declaration with Exhibits A-C regarding sealed document 292 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit F regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit E regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit D part 1 and part 2 regarding exhibit, 293 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D part 3 Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit C regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 5 regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 4 regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 3 regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Michael Page's Declaration with Exhibit A, B part 1 and B part 2 regarding sealed document 292 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B part 1 to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B part 2 to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Google's Statement of Material Facts for Which There Is No Genuine Issue and That Entitle Defendant to Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 DECLARATION of Prashanth Koppula regarding Rule 56 statement 289 Redacted Public Version (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 DECLARATION of Michael Page regarding Rule 56 statement 289 Redacted Public Version (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 RULE 56 A Statement by Google Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment 273 Redacted Public Version (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Google's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment 273 Redacted Public Version (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE by Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC re sealed response 284 Notice of Filing (Foote, Robert)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC Exhibit A regarding sealed response 284 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Group Exhibit 1, # 6 Group Exhibit 2)(Foote, Robert)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Foote, Robert)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning:Google's memorandum in support of its summary judgment motion [#274] and supporting papers [##275, 276, 277, 278, 279, 280], which have been filed under seal in their entirety, are stricken without prejudice. Google may file revised papers in conformance with the court's order no later than January 8, 2010.Mailed notice (rao, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE by Google Inc. re exhibit 279 , exhibit, 276 , objections 281 , exhibit, 278 , sealed document 275 , sealed document 280 , sealed document 274 , MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for summary judgment (partial) 273 , exhibit, 277 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiffs (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Googles Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Prashanth Koppula Declaration regarding sealed document 275 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit D part 1, D part 2, E and F regarding exhibit, 276 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D part 2 to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit E to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit F to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 3, B part 4, B part 5 and C regarding exhibit, 276 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B part 4 to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B part 5 to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration with Exhibit A, B part 1 and B part 2 regarding sealed document 275 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B part 1 to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B part 2 to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Googles Statement of Material Facts for Which There Is No Genuine Issue and That Entitle Defendant to Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Googles Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for summary judgment (partial) (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE by Joseph Gratz of Change of Address (Gratz, Joseph)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE by Michael Henry Page of Change of Address (Page, Michael)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 STIPULATED PRE-TRIAL PROTECTIVE Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 7/30/2009:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Telephone status hearing held. Parties' oral motion for entry of pre-trial protective order is granted. Motion hearing previously set for 8/07/09 is stricken. Enter Stipulated Pre-Trial Protective Order.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Status hearing held and continued to 1/21/10 at 9:45 a.m. Defendant's motion for protective order is entered and continued to 8/07/09 at 9:45 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Pursuant to stipulations of dismissal (258)(259)(260), this action as to defendants Dotster, Inc., Sedo.com, and Oversee.net are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (mb, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Google's motion to limit discovery and for a scheduling order [246-1] is granted in part. As specified in the court's standing order, Google shall serve (not file) its opening summary judgment motion no later than 30 days after the date of entry of this order. Concurrent with its opening motion, Google will produce all evidence it believes relevant to its motion. The plaintiffs' response shall be served within 120 days thereafter. During that period, the plaintiffs can request additional discovery they believe necessary to oppose the motion. Google's reply brief shall be served no later than 30 days after receiving the plaintiffs' response brief. Google may request any additional discovery necessary to reply to the plaintiffs' response brief. Mailed notice (rth, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Defendant Google's motion to withdraw as counsel of record 261 is granted. Aaron Van Oort is given leave to withdraw his appearance on behalf of Google. Motion hearing previously set for 6/19/09 is stricken. Attorney Aaron Daniel Van Oort terminated.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 261 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/19/2009 at 09:45 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: This case having been referred, in part, for ruling on all nondispositive pretrial motions, Aaron Van Oort's motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant Google Inc. 261 shall be re-noticed before Magistrate Judge Brown.Mailed notice (rth, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 261 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/18/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Google Inc. to withdraw as attorney by Aaron Van Oort (Moran, Mariah)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Foote, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Martin, Misty)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Foote, Robert)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: No later than June 12, 2009, the Parking Company Defendants are directed to file a joint statement, no more than 5 pages long, discussing the exact claims as to which they intend to move for summary judgment. For each claim upon which the Parking Company Defendants intend to move for summary judgment, the statement shall indicate whether the claim can be jointly briefed, and if not, specific reasons why not. Mailed notice (rth, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM motion for discovery 246 , memorandum in support of motion 247 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for discovery to be limited and for scheduling order 246 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Foote, Robert)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Offer of Judgment by Sedo LLC (Martin, Misty)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants Oversee.net, Sedo.com, LLC and Dotster, Inc's motion to join Google's motion to limit discovery and for scheduling order 251 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Motion by Marlon Emile Lutfiyya for presentment of motion to join 251 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/28/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Lutfiyya, Marlon)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION by Defendants Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to join Google Inc's Motion to Limit Discovery and for Scheduling Order (Lutfiyya, Marlon)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Status hearing held and continued to 7/23/09 at 9:45 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On defendant's motion to limit discovery and for scheduling order 246 , response due no later than 5/29/2009. The response brief shall be limited to no more than 7 pages. Any reply, which is limited to no more than 5 pages, is due no later than 6/5/2009. Ruling by mail.Mailed notice (rth, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for discovery 246 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/21/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion for discovery 246 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1A (part1), # 3 Exhibit Ex 1A (part2), # 4 Exhibit Ex 1B, # 5 Exhibit Ex 1C)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for discovery to be limited and for scheduling order (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Settlement conference held. The parties are unable to reach a settlement agreement at this time. Status hearing set for 5/21/09 at 9:45 a.m. The Court will set a discovery schedule at that time.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Payne, Alexis)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Daniel Purcells motion to withdraw as counsel of record 240 is granted. As this case is referred, in part, for ruling on all nondispositive pretrial motions, in the future any motion of this kind should be noticed before Magistrate Judge Brown. Mailed notice (mb, )
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE by Ragesh K. Tangri of Change of Address (mb, )
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 240 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/3/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Google Inc. to withdraw as attorney Daniel Purcell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Telephone status hearing held. At the parties' request, settlement conference previously set for 4/07/09 is stricken and reset to 5/05/09 at 10:30 a.m. The exchange of settlement letter is extended as follows: Plaintiffs shall serve the settlement letter(s) on defendants pursuant to paragraph one of this Court's standing order for settlement conference by 03/26/09. The defendants shall serve the responsive letters to the plaintiffs' settlement letter(s) by 4/24/09. Plaintiffs' counsel shall fax or deliver copies of the letters to this Court's courtroom deputy by 4/27/09.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. Settlement conference set for 4/07/09 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiffs shall serve the settlement letter(s) on defendants pursuant to paragraph one of this Court's standing order for settlement conference by 03/16/09. The defendants shall serve the responsive letters to the plaintiffs' settlement letter(s) by 3/31/09. Plaintiffs' counsel shall fax or deliver copies of the letters to this Court's courtroom deputy by 4/01/09.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:At the Court's direction, status hearing set for 2/23/09 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall advise the Court what discovery remains to be taken, and the Court will set a discovery schedule. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 12/18/2008:(mb, )
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court denies the plaintiffs' motion for class certification 196 . Enter Memorandum and Order. Mailed notice (mb, )
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 234 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to sur-reply 227 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a response to defendants' sur-reply 231 is granted. Said brief shall be filed instanter.Mailed notice (rth, )
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 231 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/30/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file A Response to Defendants' Sur-Reply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' agreed motion for leave to file its surreply in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for class certification excess of page limitation 225 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE by Google Inc. re declaration 228 , sur-reply 227 (Moran, Mariah)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 228 DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz regarding sur-reply 227 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to motion to certify class 196 (Moran, Mariah)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 225 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/21/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Surreply) (Moran, Mariah)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file instanter reply brief in excess of fifteen pages 218 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Clarifying Statement STATEMENT by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC (Foote, Robert)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: In their reply in support of their motion for class certification, the plaintiffs modify their class definition. However, it is unclear to the court whether the plaintiffs have abandoned the other subclasses set forth in their opening brief. Accordingly, the court directs the plaintiffs to file a very brief clarifying statement no later than Thursday, October 2, 2008, setting forth all of their proposed class and subclass definitions.Mailed notice (rth, )
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court directs the defendants to file a consolidated sur-reply to the plaintiffs motion for class certification, which is due no later than October 15, 2008.Mailed notice (rth, )
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 APPENDIX reply 217 in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Foote, Robert)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 218 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/9/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Foote, Robert)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 REPLY by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Foote, Robert)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Defendant Google's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice 203 and 204 are granted. Daralyn J. Durie and R. Adam Lauridsen are given leave to appear as counsel on behalf of defendant Google. (jj, )
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE of Correction regarding 209 , 208]. (ca, ) Modified on 9/17/2008 (ca, ).
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages 205 is granted. As with all oversized briefs filed in this action, the court urges counsel to be as succinct as possible.Mailed notice (rth, )
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. re declaration 212 , declaration 211 (Moran, Mariah)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz regarding response in opposition to motion 207 Amended (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Moran, Mariah)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 DECLARATION of Itamar Simonson, Ph.D. regarding response in opposition to motion 207 Amended (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Moran, Mariah)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. re declaration 209 , declaration 208 (Moran, Mariah)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz regarding response in opposition to motion 207 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J)(Moran, Mariah) # 2 ENTERED IN ERROR
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 DECLARATION of Itamar Simonson regarding response in opposition to motion 207 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah) #(2) ENTERED IN ERROR.
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 RESPONSE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC to certify class 196 (Moran, Mariah)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 205 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/16/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Moran, Mariah)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003091686. by R. Adam Lauridsen (Lauridsen, Robert)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003091437. by Daralyn J. Durie (Durie, Daralyn)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing held on 9/4/2008. Plaintiffs' Motion for class certification 196 is entered. Briefing schedule on the motion already set. Ruling will be by mail unless otherwise notified. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file instanter brief in excess of fifteen pages 199 is granted. No more than 35 pages will be allowed. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: The parties advise the Court that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 168 is withdrawn. Status hearing previously set for 08/26/08 is stricken.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 199 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/4/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file excess pages Instanter (Foote, Robert)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion to certify class 196 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/4/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM by Vulcan Golf, LLC IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Foote, Robert)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC to certify class (Foote, Robert)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ANSWER to amended complaint by Google Inc.(Moran, Mariah)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Sedo.com, LLC's ANSWER to amended complaint by Sedo LLC(Martin, Misty)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ANSWER to amended complaint by Dotster, Inc.(Dockterman, Michael)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ANSWER to amended complaint (Third Amended Complaint) by Oversee.Net(Lutfiyya, Marlon)
August 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ANSWER to amended complaint (Third Amended Complaint) by Internet Reit, Inc.(Cohn, Bradley)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 168 . By agreement of the parties, status hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 168 is continued to 08/26/08 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall advise the Court in writing and copies to counsel for all parties, if the motion is now moot and the hearing is stricken, no later than noon on 08/25/08. Mailed notice (mb, )
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/31/2008:Mailed notice(rth, )
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The motion to dismiss [166-1] is granted in part and denied in part. Given that the plaintiffs have now had three opportunities to properly plead their RICO claims, the motion to dismiss those counts is with prejudice. The plaintiffs shall file within 21 days of the date of entry of this order their motion for class certification. The defendants shall file a consolidated response within 21 days thereafter and the plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, within 14 days thereafter. Enter Memorandum and Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the parties' request, status hearing previously set for 07/29/08 is stricken and reset to 08/12/08 at 10:00 a.m.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the parties' request, status hearing previously set for 07/15/08 is stricken and reset to 07/29/08 at 10:00 a.m.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Matthew J. Herman (Herman, Matthew)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Plaintiffs' Supplement to Response Brief in Light of the United States Supreme Court's Ruling in Bridge v. Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Co., et al. by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 held and continued to 7/15/2008 at 10:00 AM.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Craig S. Mielke (Mielke, Craig)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/12/08. (mb, )
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Status hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 held and continued to 06/24/08 at 10:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STATUS Report of all Parties by Internet Reit, Inc. (Payne, Alexis)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPLY MEMORANDUM Of Law by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Dotster, Inc.,Google Inc, Oversee.Net, and Sedo LLC in Support of consolidated motion to dismiss the third party amended complaint 165 . (Dockterman, Michael) Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/2/2008 (lcw, ).
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:At the parties' request, status hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 previously set for 06/02/08 is stricken and reset to 06/10/08 at 10:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Ragesh K. Tangri; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624002790 (mb, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Daniel Purcell; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624002789 (mb, )
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 2/20/2008; Before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (Document not scanned) (aac, )
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' agreed joint motion for leave to file reply brief in excess of page limitation 170 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:This matter having been referred to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown for proceedings with respect to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 , an initial status hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Brown on 06/02/08 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1812 for the purpose of setting a schedule for such proceedings. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for leave to file 170 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/29/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. for leave to file Reply Brief in excess of page limitation (Agreed) (Conlon, Alison)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE by Vulcan Golf, LLC to MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss (CONSOLIDATED) the Third Amended Class Action Complaint 165 (Attachments: # 1 Motion)(Foote, Robert)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A-H)(Foote, Robert)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The motion for leave to file a motion for preliminary injunctive relief [152-1] is granted as to the named plaintiffs only. The motion for leave to file a motion for preliminary injunctive relief on behalf of the putative class is denied. The plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunctive relief on behalf of themselves only by Wednesday, May 7, 2008. After it is filed, the motion for preliminary injunctive relief will be referred to the magistrate judge. The parties are directed to meet and confer as set forth below. Mailed notice (rth, )
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 165 (CONSOLIDATED) the Third Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Dockterman, Michael)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss (CONSOLIDATED) the Third Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Dockterman, Michael)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' agreed motion for leave to file brief in excess of page limitation 162 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 162 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/1/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (AGREED) (Conlon, Alison)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPLY by Vulcan Golf, LLC to response to motion, 156 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Foote, Robert)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Third AMENDED complaint by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC against all defendants (Foote, Robert)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:In light of the District Judge's order of 04/14/08 staying discovery, status hearing set for 04/15/08 is stricken to be reset at a later time.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Blitz Realty Group, Inc. against all defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mb, )
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint [148-1] is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint without the declaratory judgment action count, but with no additional changes, no later than Friday, April 18, 2008. The defendants motion to dismiss is due no later than May 2, 2008. The plaintiffs response is due no later than May 16, 2008, and any reply is due no later than May 30, 2008. The plaintiffs motions for leave to file their motion for preliminary injunctive relief and supplement and to conduct expedited limited discovery [150-1 and 152-1] are taken under advisement. The plaintiffs reply is due no later than April 25, 2008. No appearance in this court is necessary on either motion on the noticed date of April 15, 2008. All discovery remains stayed pending this courts resolution of the plaintiffs motion for leave to file preliminary injunctive relief. Mailed notice (rth, )
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Second Amended Complaint 148 , MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Supplement and to Conduct Expedited Limited Discovery 152 (Wiegand, Thomas)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 2/5/2008; Before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (Document not scanned). (ca, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 152 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/15/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the parties' request, status hearing previously set for 4/15/08 at 9:45 a.m. is stricken and reset to 04/15/08 at 11:30 a.m. following the motion hearing before the District Judge. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Supplement and to Conduct Expedited Limited Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Foote, Robert)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 150 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/15/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Supplement and to Conduct Expedited Limited Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Foote, Robert)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 148 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/15/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Second Amended Complaint)(Foote, Robert)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing set for 4/15/08 at 9:45 a.m. At the status hearing, the parties shall be prepared to recommend a schedule for discovery. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STATUS Report (Joint) by Internet Reit, Inc., John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC, Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. (Wiegand, Thomas)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/20/2008:Mailed notice(rth, )
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The defendants' motions to dismiss [98-1] are granted in part and denied in part. The plaintiffs are given 21 days to replead all dismissed counts provided they can do so within the confines of Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. In the meantime, the court deems it appropriate to begin briefing on the motion for class certification. The court instructs the parties to meet and confer regarding a briefing schedule and to file with the clerk a joint proposed briefing schedule no later than April 2, 2008. Enter Memorandum and Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Marlon Emile Lutfiyya (Lutfiyya, Marlon)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Ms. Carter's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for defendant Oversee.net i 139 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Thomas Joseph Wiegand (Wiegand, Thomas)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 139 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/28/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Oversee.Net to withdraw as attorney (Carter, Janelle)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown:Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion for protective order 133 is denied without prejudice to the parties submitting a revised protective order reflecting the Court's comments on the record. Motion hearing set for 02/27/08 is stricken.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Henry M. Baskerville (Baskerville, Henry)
February 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for protective order 133 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 2/27/2008 at 09:45 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date: 1/7/2008; Before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (Document Not Scanned). (ef, )
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for protective order 133 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 2/20/2008 at 09:45 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for protective order (AGREED) (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing held on 2/5/2008. Motion hearing held. For the reasons discussed in open court, the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction [122-1] and motion to supplement the preliminary injunction [127-1] are stricken without prejudice as premature. Given the discussion in open court regarding the timing of the class certification motion, the court's February 1, 2008, order is vacated. Thus, no briefs regarding the timing of a class certification motion are to be filed on February 13, 2008. The court will rule on the pending motions to dismiss as expeditiously as possible. New dates will be in the ruling.Mailed notice (rth, )
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. No later than 7 days following the ruling on the pending motions to dismiss, lead counsel for the parties shall meet to discuss a schedule for discovery and the motion for class certification. No later than 3 business days after that meeting, the parties shall submit the proposed discovery schedule, noting the subjects on which they agree and noting the subjects on which there is a difference. A further status before this Court will be set by an order.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : For the reasons stated below, the court directs the parties to file short position papers as to the timing of the class certification motion. The defendants shall file a joint position paper. The parties position papers shall be no more than 7 pages in length and should be filed no later than Wednesday, February 13, 2008. Mailed notice (rth, )
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Bryan L Clobes; Order entered granting leave by Judge Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10651468 (mb, )
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction 122 , motion to supplement 127 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Dominic J. Rizzi (Rizzi, Dominic)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Nyran Rose Pearson (Pearson, Nyran)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : Status hearing held and continued to 02/05/08 at 11:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's motion to compel Rule 26 disclosures 121 is stricken without prejudice. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE by Misty Rose Martin of Change of Address (Martin, Misty)
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Foote, Robert)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STATUS Report by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Foote, Robert)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. regarding status report 117 , notice of filing 118 (Payne, Alexis)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. re status report 117 (Payne, Alexis)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STATUS Report by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. (Payne, Alexis)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : The referral of this matter having been assigned to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown, an initial status hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Brown on 01/07/08 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1812. The parties shall deliver a copy of an initial status report providing the information required by Judge Brown's Order Setting Initial Status Report to the Courtroom Deputy (Room 1808) three business days before the initial status hearing. See www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGE BROWN.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 116 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to magistrate judge Geraldine Soat Brown for discovery supervision, settlement conference and all nondispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/7/07. (mb, )
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing set for 12/6/2007 is reset to 2/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. Mailed notice (rth, )
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Case Management Conference STATEMENT by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Moran, Mariah)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 08/21/07; Before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. (ar, )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing set for 11/29/2007 is reset to 12/6/2007 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY by Internet Reit, Inc. to response to motion, 104 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Borgman, Steven)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to motion to dismiss 98 (Dockterman, Michael)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY by Defendant Google Inc. in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (Moran, Mariah)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPLY by Defendant Oversee.Net to motion to dismiss 98 (Carter, Janelle)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE by Sedo LLCin Support of MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint (Consolidated Motion) 98 (Foukas, Anastasios)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sedo LLC by Anastasios T. Foukas (Foukas, Anastasios)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE by Vulcan Golf, LLC to MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint (Consolidated Motion) 98 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D (1 of 2)# 5 Exhibit D (2 of 2)# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Motion to Amend# 9 Motion for Leave)(Foote, Robert)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM by Oversee.Net in support of motion to dismiss 98 First Amended Class Action Complaint (Carter, Janelle)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM by Sedo LLC in support of motion to dismiss 98 (Martin, Misty)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM motion to dismiss 98 by Google Inc. in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Moran, Mariah)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 98 Amended Class Action Complaint (Borgman, Steven)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 98 Amended Class Action Complaint (Dockterman, Michael)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint (Consolidated Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Dockterman, Michael)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Defendants' motions for leave to file separate motions 93 94 are granted in part and denied in part. The court intended to require the defendants to file a consolidated motion to dismiss to the extent possible and to allow them to file separate supplemental briefs addressing any individual issues. The court regrets any confusion. The defendants seek to file five separate 35-page briefs. Assuming that they use all of these pages, they will file a total of 175 pages which may contain duplicative arguments or factual summaries. The record does not show that this extraordinary number of pages is necessary. Accordingly, the court directs the defendants to file a consolidated brief to the extent possible that contains any common arguments (between all or some of the defendants) as well as a joint summary of relevant facts. Contrary to its statements in open court, they may then file separate briefs addressing individual arguments, not to exceed 20 pages each. If any defendant believes that additional pages are necessary, it must file a motion articulating specific bases for such a request. Mailed notice (rth, )
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 93 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/4/2007 at 11:00 AM. (Martin, Misty)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file 94 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/4/2007 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file Separate Motion and Supporting Brief to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (Moran, Mariah)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLCLeave to File Individual Briefs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Misty)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 for Leave NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/4/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Martin, Misty)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Aaron Daniel Van Oort (Van Oort, Aaron)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing held and continued to 11/29/2007 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery is stayed until the next status. Rule 26(a)disclosures shall be made by 11/5/2007. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the amendments by 10/18/2007. Defendants oral motion for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages up to 35 pages is granted. Defendants shall file aconsolidated motion to dismiss and reply. Plaintiffs consolidated response to defendants motion to dismiss to be filed by 11/5/2007. Plaintiff granted same page limit for its response. Defendants reply to be filed by 11/13/2007. Mailed notice (mb, )
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 First AMENDED complaint by Vulcan Golf, LLC against all defendants (Foote, Robert)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENTERED in error. See number 89. (Foote, Robert). (Text edited by Clerk's Office). Modified on 9/19/2007 (ar, ).
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli (Bulgarelli, Mark)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Dana Marie Pesha (Pesha, Dana)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by William J. Harte (Harte, William)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Status hearing set for 9/20/2007 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Blanche M. Manning from Judge Charles P. Kocoras for all further proceedings, pursuant to IOP 13F2, signed by Judge Executive Committee on 08/21/07. (See order for further detail). Mailed notice(ar, )
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Status and motion hearing held on 8/21/2007. Plaintiff is given leave to file an amended complaint on or before 9/18/2007. All pending motions to dismiss 52 58 59 70 75 are denied without prejudice. All pending motions for leave to file in excess of fifteen pages 51 57 are moot. Discovery is stayed until the pleadings are in order. Hearing on defendant Oversee.net's motion 75 to dismiss, set for 8/28/2007, is stricken as moot.Mailed notice (sct, )
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sedo LLC (Martin, Misty)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dotster, Inc. by Robert L. Hickok; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10911342 (mb, )
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dotster, Inc. by Joanna J. Cline; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10911342 (mb, )
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dotster, Inc. by Vincent V. Carissimi; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10911342 (mb, )
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion to dismiss 75 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/28/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM by Oversee.Net in support of motion to dismiss 75 (Carter, Janelle)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION by Defendant Oversee.Net to dismiss (Carter, Janelle)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Google Inc. (Moran, Mariah)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Defendant Internet Reit, Inc.'s Local Rule 3.2 Statement by Internet Reit, Inc. (Held, Kenneth)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Motion by Michael R. Dockterman for presentment of motion to dismiss 70 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 9:30 AM. (Dockterman, Michael)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM by Dotster, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 70 Plaintiff's RICO Claims, and other Non-Trademark Related Claims, in the Class Action Complaint (Dockterman, Michael)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION by Defendant Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's RICO Claims, and other Non-Trademark Related Claims, in the Class Action Complaint (Dockterman, Michael)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dotster, Inc. (Dockterman, Michael)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Oversee.net's agreed motion 64 for leave to file briefs in excess of page limitation is granted. Oversee is given leave to file brief of up to 30 pages in support of its motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is given leave to file a brief of up to 30 pages in response to Oversee's motion to dismiss. Oversee is given leave to file reply brief of up to 15 pages. Hearing on Oversee's motion 64 for leave to file briefs in excess of page limitation, set for 8/15/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oversee.Net by Steven D. Atlee; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10649255 (mb, )
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Dotster, Inc. a/k/a RevenueDirect.com's agreed motion 55 for leave to file oversize brief is granted. Said brief is limited to 25 pages. Hearing on said motion, set for 8/14/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 64 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/15/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION by Defendant Oversee.Net for leave to file excess pages (AGREED) (Carter, Janelle)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to dismiss 58 , motion for leave to file excess pages 57 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 59 (August, Brett)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 58 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Moran, Mariah)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Brett A. August for presentment of motion to dismiss 59 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (August, Brett)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. to dismiss (August, Brett)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. to dismiss (Moran, Mariah)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Agreed) (Moran, Mariah)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 55 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/14/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION by Defendant Dotster, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Oversized Brief) (Agreed) (Conlon, Alison)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Re- NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of motion to dismiss 52 , motion for leave to file excess pages 51 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Martin, Misty)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of motion to dismiss 52 , motion for leave to file excess pages 51 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Martin, Misty)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLC to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support)(Martin, Misty)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLC for leave to file excess pages (Martin, Misty)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Motion hearing held on 8/9/2007. Defendant Reit's motion 49 for leave to file brief in excess of page limitation, is granted. Brief is limited to 30 pages. Mailed notice (sct, )
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Payne, Alexis)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Motion by Alexis Elizabeth Payne for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/9/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Payne, Alexis)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Oversee.net's agreed motion 45 for an extension of time to 8/17/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Hearing on said motion, set for 8/9/2007, is stricken. Parties are reminded that the correct case number is 07-cv-3371. Mailed notice (sct, )
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 45 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/9/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION by Defendant Oversee.Net for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (AGREED) (Carter, Janelle)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Janelle M. Carter (Carter, Janelle)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Ronald Y Rothstein (Rothstein, Ronald)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Joseph Gratz (Gratz, Joseph)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Michael Page (Page, Michael)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Dotster, Inc. a/k/a RevenueDirect.com's agreed motion 36 for an extension of time to 8/15/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Hearing on said motion, set for 7/31/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. by Alexis Elizabeth Payne (mb, )
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. by Bradley Louis Cohn (mb, )
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 36 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION by Defendant Dotster, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Conlon, Alison)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dotster, Inc. by Alison C Conlon (Conlon, Alison)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dotster, Inc. by Michael R. Dockterman (Dockterman, Michael)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. by Brett A. August (August, Brett)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Google, Inc.'s agreed motion 15 for an extension of time to 8/10/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Defendant Internet Reit, Inc.'s unopposed motion 18 to extend time to 8/10/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Defendant Seco.com's motion 26 for an extension of time to 9/15/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is denied. Seco.com is given to 8/10/2007 to answer or otherwise plead. Hearing on all pending motions, set for 7/31/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Michael Page; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10723738. (ar, )
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Joseph Gratz; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10723737. (ar, )
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Internet Reit, Inc. by Kenneth P. Held; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10340330 (Exhibit). (ar, )
July 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Internet Reit, Inc. by Steven R. Borgman; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10340329. (ar, )
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of extension of time 26 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Martin, Misty)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLC for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Martin, Misty)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sedo LLC by Misty Rose Martin (Martin, Misty)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sedo LLC by Jeffrey Singer (Singer, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Dotster, Inc. on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. (Foote, Robert)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Oversee.Net on 7/18/2007, answer due 8/7/2007. (Foote, Robert)
July 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Internet Reit, Inc.'s Amended NOTICE of Motion by Scott Ryan Wiehle for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 18 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Wiehle, Scott)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of extension of time 15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Internet Reit, Inc. re Unopposed motion by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc., to respond to plaintifff's complaint 18 (hp, )
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. d/b/a Ireit, Inc., by Scott Ryan Wiehle (hp, )
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. d/b/a Ireit, Inc's unopposed motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's complaint (hp, )
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of extension of time 15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/17/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Agreed) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Mariah E Moran (Moran, Mariah)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Joseph J. Duffy (Duffy, Joseph)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Jonathan M. Cyrluk (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Status hearing set for 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing.Mailed notice (sct, )
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Sedo LLC on 6/27/2007, answer due 7/17/2007. (Foote, Robert)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Internet Reit, Inc. on 6/20/2007, answer due 7/10/2007. (Foote, Robert)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Google Inc. on 6/20/2007, answer due 7/10/2007. (Foote, Robert)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (mb, )
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. (mb, )
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Kathleen Currie Chavez (mb, )
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Stephen William Fung (mb, )
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Robert M. Foote (mb, )
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (mb, )
June 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Vulcan Golf, LLC; (Exhibits) Jury Demand.(mb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vulcan Golf, LLC v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vulcan Golf, LLC
Represented By: Dominic J. Rizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic J. Rizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blitz Realty Group, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic J. Rizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent E Jackson
Represented By: Dominic J. Rizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Van Oort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oversee.Net
Represented By: Ronald Y Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedo LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dotster, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Reit, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Ryan Wiehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?