August 12, 2010 |
Filing 330
MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. Settlement conference remains set for 10/26/10 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall serve the settlement letter on defendant pursuant to paragraph one of this Court's standing order for settlement conference by 9/13/10. The defendant shall serve the responsive letter to the plaintiffs' settlement letter by 10/13/10. Plaintiffs' counsel shall fax or deliver copies of the letters to this Court's courtroom deputy by 10/18/10.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 329
MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held and continued to 8/12/10 at 9:30 a.m. Settlement conference set for 10/26/10 at 1:30 p.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing 328
MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the court's direction, status hearing set for 6/18/10 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing 327
MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/9/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing 326
MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: For the reasons stated herein, Google's motion for partial summary judgment [273-1] is denied. Before setting a trial date, the court directs the parties to contact the magistrate judge's chambers to set a date for a settlement conference. Given that this ruling presumably narrows the relevant issues, the court again strongly urges the parties to attempt to resolve this matter. Enter Memorandum and Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing 325
MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs 323 is granted. Dana M. Pesha is given leave to withdraw on behalf of the plaintiffs. Motion hearing date of 6/11/10 is stricken. Attorney Dana Marie Pesha terminated.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing 324
NOTICE of Motion by Dana Marie Pesha for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 323 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/11/2010 at 09:45 AM. (Pesha, Dana)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing 323
MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC to withdraw as attorney (Pesha, Dana)
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing 320
NOTICE by Matthew J. Herman of Change of Address (Herman, Matthew)
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing 319
NOTICE by Kathleen Currie Chavez of Change of Address (Chavez, Kathleen)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 318
NOTICE by Craig S. Mielke of Change of Address (Mielke, Craig)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 317
NOTICE by William J. Harte of Change of Address (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harte, William)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 316
NOTICE by Dana Marie Pesha of Change of Address (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Pesha, Dana)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing 315
MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. Parties advise the Court that another settlement conference would not be useful at this time. Plaintiff's counsel shall advise the Court when a ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgment is issued by the District Judge and a status hearing will be set. If the parties agree that a further settlement conference would be useful, they shall contact Judge Brown's courtroom deputy.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 314
MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant's motion for leave to file corrected version of its reply memorandum of points and authorities in support for partial summary judgment 305 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 313
CERTIFICATE of Service by Robert M. Foote on behalf of Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC regarding sealed document, 310 , Response, 308 (Foote, Robert)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 312
RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC to objections 281 (Foote, Robert)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 311
NOTICE by Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC re sealed document, 309 , memorandum in opposition to motion 307 , sealed document, 310 , Response, 308 (Foote, Robert)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 310
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO GOOGLE'S RULE 56.1 STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Foote, Robert)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 309
SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Foote, Robert)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 308
RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC to Rule 56 statement 289 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Foote, Robert)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing 307
MEMORANDUM by Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC in Opposition to motion for summary judgment 273 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION (Foote, Robert)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 306
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file 305 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 1/12/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 305
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file Corrected Version of its Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support for Partial Summary Judgment (Moran, Mariah)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 304
NOTICE by Google Inc. re exhibit 296 , Rule 56 statement 289 , declaration 290 , exhibit 300 , exhibit 294 , sealed document 288 , memorandum in support of motion 287 , exhibit 297 , exhibit 298 , declaration 291 , exhibit 301 , exhibit, 293 , sealed document 303 , sealed document 292 , exhibit 299 , reply 302 , exhibit 295 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 303
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Google's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 302
REPLY by Defendant Google Inc. to motion for summary judgment 273 Redacted Public Version (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 301
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Prashanth Koppula Declaration with Exhibits A-C regarding sealed document 292 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 300
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit F regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 299
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit E regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 298
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit D part 1 and part 2 regarding exhibit, 293 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D part 3 Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 297
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit C regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 296
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 5 regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 295
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 4 regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 294
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 3 regarding exhibit, 293 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 293
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Michael Page's Declaration with Exhibit A, B part 1 and B part 2 regarding sealed document 292 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B part 1 to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B part 2 to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 292
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Google's Statement of Material Facts for Which There Is No Genuine Issue and That Entitle Defendant to Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 291
DECLARATION of Prashanth Koppula regarding Rule 56 statement 289 Redacted Public Version (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 290
DECLARATION of Michael Page regarding Rule 56 statement 289 Redacted Public Version (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 289
RULE 56 A Statement by Google Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment 273 Redacted Public Version (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 288
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Google's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 287
MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment 273 Redacted Public Version (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 286
NOTICE by Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC re sealed response 284 Notice of Filing (Foote, Robert)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 285
SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Vulcan Golf, LLC Exhibit A regarding sealed response 284 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Group Exhibit 1, # 6 Group Exhibit 2)(Foote, Robert)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 284
SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Foote, Robert)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 283
MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning:Google's memorandum in support of its summary judgment motion [#274] and supporting papers [##275, 276, 277, 278, 279, 280], which have been filed under seal in their entirety, are stricken without prejudice. Google may file revised papers in conformance with the court's order no later than January 8, 2010.Mailed notice (rao, )
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 282
NOTICE by Google Inc. re exhibit 279 , exhibit, 276 , objections 281 , exhibit, 278 , sealed document 275 , sealed document 280 , sealed document 274 , MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for summary judgment (partial) 273 , exhibit, 277 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 281
OBJECTIONS to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiffs (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 280
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Googles Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 279
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Prashanth Koppula Declaration regarding sealed document 275 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 278
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit D part 1, D part 2, E and F regarding exhibit, 276 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D part 2 to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit E to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit F to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 277
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration Exhibit B part 3, B part 4, B part 5 and C regarding exhibit, 276 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B part 4 to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B part 5 to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 276
SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc. Page Declaration with Exhibit A, B part 1 and B part 2 regarding sealed document 275 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Page Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B part 1 to Page Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B part 2 to Page Declaration)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 275
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Googles Statement of Material Facts for Which There Is No Genuine Issue and That Entitle Defendant to Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 274
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc. Googles Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 273
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for summary judgment (partial) (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
December 21, 2009 |
Filing 272
NOTICE by Joseph Gratz of Change of Address (Gratz, Joseph)
|
December 21, 2009 |
Filing 271
NOTICE by Michael Henry Page of Change of Address (Page, Michael)
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 270
STIPULATED PRE-TRIAL PROTECTIVE Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 7/30/2009:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 269
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Telephone status hearing held. Parties' oral motion for entry of pre-trial protective order is granted. Motion hearing previously set for 8/07/09 is stricken. Enter Stipulated Pre-Trial Protective Order.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing 268
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Status hearing held and continued to 1/21/10 at 9:45 a.m. Defendant's motion for protective order is entered and continued to 8/07/09 at 9:45 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 24, 2009 |
Filing 267
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Pursuant to stipulations of dismissal (258)(259)(260), this action as to defendants Dotster, Inc., Sedo.com, and Oversee.net are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (mb, )
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing 266
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Google's motion to limit discovery and for a scheduling order [246-1] is granted in part. As specified in the court's standing order, Google shall serve (not file) its opening summary judgment motion no later than 30 days after the date of entry of this order. Concurrent with its opening motion, Google will produce all evidence it believes relevant to its motion. The plaintiffs' response shall be served within 120 days thereafter. During that period, the plaintiffs can request additional discovery they believe necessary to oppose the motion. Google's reply brief shall be served no later than 30 days after receiving the plaintiffs' response brief. Google may request any additional discovery necessary to reply to the plaintiffs' response brief. Mailed notice (rth, )
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 265
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Defendant Google's motion to withdraw as counsel of record 261 is granted. Aaron Van Oort is given leave to withdraw his appearance on behalf of Google. Motion hearing previously set for 6/19/09 is stricken. Attorney Aaron Daniel Van Oort terminated.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing 264
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 261 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/19/2009 at 09:45 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 263
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: This case having been referred, in part, for ruling on all nondispositive pretrial motions, Aaron Van Oort's motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant Google Inc. 261 shall be re-noticed before Magistrate Judge Brown.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 262
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 261 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/18/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 261
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Google Inc. to withdraw as attorney by Aaron Van Oort (Moran, Mariah)
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing 260
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Foote, Robert)
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing 259
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Martin, Misty)
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing 258
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Foote, Robert)
|
June 5, 2009 |
Filing 257
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: No later than June 12, 2009, the Parking Company Defendants are directed to file a joint statement, no more than 5 pages long, discussing the exact claims as to which they intend to move for summary judgment. For each claim upon which the Parking Company Defendants intend to move for summary judgment, the statement shall indicate whether the claim can be jointly briefed, and if not, specific reasons why not. Mailed notice (rth, )
|
June 5, 2009 |
Filing 256
MEMORANDUM motion for discovery 246 , memorandum in support of motion 247 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
May 29, 2009 |
Filing 255
RESPONSE by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for discovery to be limited and for scheduling order 246 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Foote, Robert)
|
May 28, 2009 |
Filing 254
Offer of Judgment by Sedo LLC (Martin, Misty)
|
May 27, 2009 |
Filing 253
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants Oversee.net, Sedo.com, LLC and Dotster, Inc's motion to join Google's motion to limit discovery and for scheduling order 251 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
May 22, 2009 |
Filing 252
NOTICE of Motion by Marlon Emile Lutfiyya for presentment of motion to join 251 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/28/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Lutfiyya, Marlon)
|
May 22, 2009 |
Filing 251
MOTION by Defendants Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to join Google Inc's Motion to Limit Discovery and for Scheduling Order (Lutfiyya, Marlon)
|
May 21, 2009 |
Filing 250
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Status hearing held and continued to 7/23/09 at 9:45 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing 249
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On defendant's motion to limit discovery and for scheduling order 246 , response due no later than 5/29/2009. The response brief shall be limited to no more than 7 pages. Any reply, which is limited to no more than 5 pages, is due no later than 6/5/2009. Ruling by mail.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 248
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for discovery 246 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/21/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 247
MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion for discovery 246 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1A (part1), # 3 Exhibit Ex 1A (part2), # 4 Exhibit Ex 1B, # 5 Exhibit Ex 1C)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
May 18, 2009 |
Filing 246
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for discovery to be limited and for scheduling order (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
May 5, 2009 |
Filing 245
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Settlement conference held. The parties are unable to reach a settlement agreement at this time. Status hearing set for 5/21/09 at 9:45 a.m. The Court will set a discovery schedule at that time.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
April 24, 2009 |
Filing 244
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Payne, Alexis)
|
March 2, 2009 |
Filing 242
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Daniel Purcells motion to withdraw as counsel of record 240 is granted. As this case is referred, in part, for ruling on all nondispositive pretrial motions, in the future any motion of this kind should be noticed before Magistrate Judge Brown. Mailed notice (mb, )
|
February 25, 2009 |
Filing 243
NOTICE by Ragesh K. Tangri of Change of Address (mb, )
|
February 25, 2009 |
Filing 241
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 240 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/3/2009 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
February 25, 2009 |
Filing 240
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Google Inc. to withdraw as attorney Daniel Purcell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah)
|
February 24, 2009 |
Filing 239
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Telephone status hearing held. At the parties' request, settlement conference previously set for 4/07/09 is stricken and reset to 5/05/09 at 10:30 a.m. The exchange of settlement letter is extended as follows: Plaintiffs shall serve the settlement letter(s) on defendants pursuant to paragraph one of this Court's standing order for settlement conference by 03/26/09. The defendants shall serve the responsive letters to the plaintiffs' settlement letter(s) by 4/24/09. Plaintiffs' counsel shall fax or deliver copies of the letters to this Court's courtroom deputy by 4/27/09.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
February 23, 2009 |
Filing 238
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. Settlement conference set for 4/07/09 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiffs shall serve the settlement letter(s) on defendants pursuant to paragraph one of this Court's standing order for settlement conference by 03/16/09. The defendants shall serve the responsive letters to the plaintiffs' settlement letter(s) by 3/31/09. Plaintiffs' counsel shall fax or deliver copies of the letters to this Court's courtroom deputy by 4/01/09.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
February 4, 2009 |
Filing 237
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:At the Court's direction, status hearing set for 2/23/09 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall advise the Court what discovery remains to be taken, and the Court will set a discovery schedule. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
December 18, 2008 |
Filing 236
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 12/18/2008:(mb, )
|
December 18, 2008 |
Filing 235
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court denies the plaintiffs' motion for class certification 196 . Enter Memorandum and Order. Mailed notice (mb, )
|
October 29, 2008 |
Filing 234
RESPONSE by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to sur-reply 227 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
|
October 29, 2008 |
Filing 233
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a response to defendants' sur-reply 231 is granted. Said brief shall be filed instanter.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
October 21, 2008 |
Filing 232
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 231 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/30/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
October 21, 2008 |
Filing 231
MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file A Response to Defendants' Sur-Reply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
|
October 20, 2008 |
Filing 230
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' agreed motion for leave to file its surreply in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for class certification excess of page limitation 225 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
October 15, 2008 |
Filing 229
NOTICE by Google Inc. re declaration 228 , sur-reply 227 (Moran, Mariah)
|
October 15, 2008 |
Filing 228
DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz regarding sur-reply 227 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah)
|
October 15, 2008 |
Filing 227
SUR-REPLY by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to motion to certify class 196 (Moran, Mariah)
|
October 15, 2008 |
Filing 226
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 225 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/21/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
October 15, 2008 |
Filing 225
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Surreply) (Moran, Mariah)
|
October 8, 2008 |
Filing 224
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file instanter reply brief in excess of fifteen pages 218 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
October 2, 2008 |
Filing 223
Clarifying Statement STATEMENT by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC (Foote, Robert)
|
October 1, 2008 |
Filing 222
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: In their reply in support of their motion for class certification, the plaintiffs modify their class definition. However, it is unclear to the court whether the plaintiffs have abandoned the other subclasses set forth in their opening brief. Accordingly, the court directs the plaintiffs to file a very brief clarifying statement no later than Thursday, October 2, 2008, setting forth all of their proposed class and subclass definitions.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
September 29, 2008 |
Filing 221
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court directs the defendants to file a consolidated sur-reply to the plaintiffs motion for class certification, which is due no later than October 15, 2008.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
September 25, 2008 |
Filing 220
APPENDIX reply 217 in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Foote, Robert)
|
September 25, 2008 |
Filing 219
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 218 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/9/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
September 25, 2008 |
Filing 218
MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Foote, Robert)
|
September 25, 2008 |
Filing 217
REPLY by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Foote, Robert)
|
September 18, 2008 |
Filing 216
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Defendant Google's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice 203 and 204 are granted. Daralyn J. Durie and R. Adam Lauridsen are given leave to appear as counsel on behalf of defendant Google. (jj, )
|
September 16, 2008 |
Filing 215
NOTICE of Correction regarding 209 , 208]. (ca, ) Modified on 9/17/2008 (ca, ).
|
September 15, 2008 |
Filing 214
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages 205 is granted. As with all oversized briefs filed in this action, the court urges counsel to be as succinct as possible.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 213
NOTICE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. re declaration 212 , declaration 211 (Moran, Mariah)
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 212
DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz regarding response in opposition to motion 207 Amended (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Moran, Mariah)
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 211
DECLARATION of Itamar Simonson, Ph.D. regarding response in opposition to motion 207 Amended (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Moran, Mariah)
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 210
NOTICE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. re declaration 209 , declaration 208 (Moran, Mariah)
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 209
DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz regarding response in opposition to motion 207 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J)(Moran, Mariah) # 2 ENTERED IN ERROR
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 208
DECLARATION of Itamar Simonson regarding response in opposition to motion 207 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah) #(2) ENTERED IN ERROR.
|
September 11, 2008 |
Filing 207
RESPONSE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC to certify class 196 (Moran, Mariah)
|
September 10, 2008 |
Filing 206
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 205 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/16/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
September 10, 2008 |
Filing 205
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Moran, Mariah)
|
September 9, 2008 |
Filing 204
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003091686. by R. Adam Lauridsen (Lauridsen, Robert)
|
September 9, 2008 |
Filing 203
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000003091437. by Daralyn J. Durie (Durie, Daralyn)
|
September 4, 2008 |
Filing 202
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing held on 9/4/2008. Plaintiffs' Motion for class certification 196 is entered. Briefing schedule on the motion already set. Ruling will be by mail unless otherwise notified. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file instanter brief in excess of fifteen pages 199 is granted. No more than 35 pages will be allowed. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
|
August 25, 2008 |
Filing 201
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: The parties advise the Court that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 168 is withdrawn. Status hearing previously set for 08/26/08 is stricken.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
August 21, 2008 |
Filing 200
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 199 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/4/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
August 21, 2008 |
Filing 199
MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file excess pages Instanter (Foote, Robert)
|
August 21, 2008 |
Filing 198
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion to certify class 196 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/4/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
August 21, 2008 |
Filing 197
MEMORANDUM by Vulcan Golf, LLC IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Foote, Robert)
|
August 21, 2008 |
Filing 196
MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC to certify class (Foote, Robert)
|
August 14, 2008 |
Filing 195
ANSWER to amended complaint by Google Inc.(Moran, Mariah)
|
August 14, 2008 |
Filing 194
Sedo.com, LLC's ANSWER to amended complaint by Sedo LLC(Martin, Misty)
|
August 14, 2008 |
Filing 193
ANSWER to amended complaint by Dotster, Inc.(Dockterman, Michael)
|
August 14, 2008 |
Filing 192
ANSWER to amended complaint (Third Amended Complaint) by Oversee.Net(Lutfiyya, Marlon)
|
August 14, 2008 |
Filing 191
ANSWER to amended complaint (Third Amended Complaint) by Internet Reit, Inc.(Cohn, Bradley)
|
August 12, 2008 |
Filing 190
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 168 . By agreement of the parties, status hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 168 is continued to 08/26/08 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall advise the Court in writing and copies to counsel for all parties, if the motion is now moot and the hearing is stricken, no later than noon on 08/25/08. Mailed notice (mb, )
|
July 31, 2008 |
Filing 189
MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/31/2008:Mailed notice(rth, )
|
July 31, 2008 |
Filing 188
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The motion to dismiss [166-1] is granted in part and denied in part. Given that the plaintiffs have now had three opportunities to properly plead their RICO claims, the motion to dismiss those counts is with prejudice. The plaintiffs shall file within 21 days of the date of entry of this order their motion for class certification. The defendants shall file a consolidated response within 21 days thereafter and the plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, within 14 days thereafter. Enter Memorandum and Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
July 28, 2008 |
Filing 187
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the parties' request, status hearing previously set for 07/29/08 is stricken and reset to 08/12/08 at 10:00 a.m.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
July 14, 2008 |
Filing 186
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the parties' request, status hearing previously set for 07/15/08 is stricken and reset to 07/29/08 at 10:00 a.m.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
July 9, 2008 |
Filing 185
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Matthew J. Herman (Herman, Matthew)
|
July 3, 2008 |
Filing 184
Plaintiffs' Supplement to Response Brief in Light of the United States Supreme Court's Ruling in Bridge v. Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Co., et al. by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
|
June 24, 2008 |
Filing 183
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 held and continued to 7/15/2008 at 10:00 AM.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 23, 2008 |
Filing 182
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Craig S. Mielke (Mielke, Craig)
|
June 12, 2008 |
Filing 181
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/12/08. (mb, )
|
June 10, 2008 |
Filing 180
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:Status hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 held and continued to 06/24/08 at 10:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
June 6, 2008 |
Filing 179
STATUS Report of all Parties by Internet Reit, Inc. (Payne, Alexis)
|
May 30, 2008 |
Filing 176
REPLY MEMORANDUM Of Law by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Dotster, Inc.,Google Inc, Oversee.Net, and Sedo LLC in Support of consolidated motion to dismiss the third party amended complaint 165 . (Dockterman, Michael) Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/2/2008 (lcw, ).
|
May 30, 2008 |
Filing 175
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:At the parties' request, status hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 previously set for 06/02/08 is stricken and reset to 06/10/08 at 10:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
May 29, 2008 |
Filing 178
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Ragesh K. Tangri; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624002790 (mb, )
|
May 29, 2008 |
Filing 177
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Daniel Purcell; Order entered granting leave by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 4624002789 (mb, )
|
May 29, 2008 |
Filing 174
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 2/20/2008; Before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (Document not scanned) (aac, )
|
May 28, 2008 |
Filing 173
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' agreed joint motion for leave to file reply brief in excess of page limitation 170 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
May 27, 2008 |
Filing 172
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:This matter having been referred to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown for proceedings with respect to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 168 , an initial status hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Brown on 06/02/08 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1812 for the purpose of setting a schedule for such proceedings. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
May 23, 2008 |
Filing 171
NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for leave to file 170 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/29/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
|
May 23, 2008 |
Filing 170
MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. for leave to file Reply Brief in excess of page limitation (Agreed) (Conlon, Alison)
|
May 16, 2008 |
Filing 169
RESPONSE by Vulcan Golf, LLC to MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss (CONSOLIDATED) the Third Amended Class Action Complaint 165 (Attachments: # 1 Motion)(Foote, Robert)
|
May 7, 2008 |
Filing 168
MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A-H)(Foote, Robert)
|
May 5, 2008 |
Filing 167
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The motion for leave to file a motion for preliminary injunctive relief [152-1] is granted as to the named plaintiffs only. The motion for leave to file a motion for preliminary injunctive relief on behalf of the putative class is denied. The plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunctive relief on behalf of themselves only by Wednesday, May 7, 2008. After it is filed, the motion for preliminary injunctive relief will be referred to the magistrate judge. The parties are directed to meet and confer as set forth below. Mailed notice (rth, )
|
May 2, 2008 |
Filing 166
MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 165 (CONSOLIDATED) the Third Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Dockterman, Michael)
|
May 2, 2008 |
Filing 165
MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss (CONSOLIDATED) the Third Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Dockterman, Michael)
|
April 30, 2008 |
Filing 164
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' agreed motion for leave to file brief in excess of page limitation 162 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
April 28, 2008 |
Filing 163
NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 162 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/1/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
|
April 28, 2008 |
Filing 162
MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (AGREED) (Conlon, Alison)
|
April 25, 2008 |
Filing 161
REPLY by Vulcan Golf, LLC to response to motion, 156 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Foote, Robert)
|
April 18, 2008 |
Filing 160
Third AMENDED complaint by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC against all defendants (Foote, Robert)
|
April 15, 2008 |
Filing 158
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown:In light of the District Judge's order of 04/14/08 staying discovery, status hearing set for 04/15/08 is stricken to be reset at a later time.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 159
SECOND AMENDED complaint by Blitz Realty Group, Inc. against all defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mb, )
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 157
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint [148-1] is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint without the declaratory judgment action count, but with no additional changes, no later than Friday, April 18, 2008. The defendants motion to dismiss is due no later than May 2, 2008. The plaintiffs response is due no later than May 16, 2008, and any reply is due no later than May 30, 2008. The plaintiffs motions for leave to file their motion for preliminary injunctive relief and supplement and to conduct expedited limited discovery [150-1 and 152-1] are taken under advisement. The plaintiffs reply is due no later than April 25, 2008. No appearance in this court is necessary on either motion on the noticed date of April 15, 2008. All discovery remains stayed pending this courts resolution of the plaintiffs motion for leave to file preliminary injunctive relief. Mailed notice (rth, )
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 156
RESPONSE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Second Amended Complaint 148 , MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Supplement and to Conduct Expedited Limited Discovery 152 (Wiegand, Thomas)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 155
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 2/5/2008; Before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (Document not scanned). (ca, )
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 154
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 152 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/15/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 153
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: At the parties' request, status hearing previously set for 4/15/08 at 9:45 a.m. is stricken and reset to 04/15/08 at 11:30 a.m. following the motion hearing before the District Judge. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 152
MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Supplement and to Conduct Expedited Limited Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Foote, Robert)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 151
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 150 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/15/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 150
MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Supplement and to Conduct Expedited Limited Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Foote, Robert)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 149
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for leave to file 148 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/15/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 148
MOTION by Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Second Amended Complaint)(Foote, Robert)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 147
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing set for 4/15/08 at 9:45 a.m. At the status hearing, the parties shall be prepared to recommend a schedule for discovery. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 146
STATUS Report (Joint) by Internet Reit, Inc., John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC, Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. (Wiegand, Thomas)
|
March 20, 2008 |
Filing 145
MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/20/2008:Mailed notice(rth, )
|
March 20, 2008 |
Filing 144
MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The defendants' motions to dismiss [98-1] are granted in part and denied in part. The plaintiffs are given 21 days to replead all dismissed counts provided they can do so within the confines of Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. In the meantime, the court deems it appropriate to begin briefing on the motion for class certification. The court instructs the parties to meet and confer regarding a briefing schedule and to file with the clerk a joint proposed briefing schedule no later than April 2, 2008. Enter Memorandum and Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
March 6, 2008 |
Filing 143
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Marlon Emile Lutfiyya (Lutfiyya, Marlon)
|
February 27, 2008 |
Filing 142
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Ms. Carter's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for defendant Oversee.net i 139 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
|
February 26, 2008 |
Filing 141
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Thomas Joseph Wiegand (Wiegand, Thomas)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 140
NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 139 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/28/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 139
MOTION by counsel for Defendant Oversee.Net to withdraw as attorney (Carter, Janelle)
|
February 20, 2008 |
Filing 138
MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown:Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion for protective order 133 is denied without prejudice to the parties submitting a revised protective order reflecting the Court's comments on the record. Motion hearing set for 02/27/08 is stricken.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
February 19, 2008 |
Filing 137
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Henry M. Baskerville (Baskerville, Henry)
|
February 19, 2008 |
Filing 136
AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for protective order 133 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 2/27/2008 at 09:45 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
February 14, 2008 |
Filing 135
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date: 1/7/2008; Before the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown. (Document Not Scanned). (ef, )
|
February 6, 2008 |
Filing 134
NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for protective order 133 before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 2/20/2008 at 09:45 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
February 6, 2008 |
Filing 133
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for protective order (AGREED) (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
February 5, 2008 |
Filing 132
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing held on 2/5/2008. Motion hearing held. For the reasons discussed in open court, the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction [122-1] and motion to supplement the preliminary injunction [127-1] are stricken without prejudice as premature. Given the discussion in open court regarding the timing of the class certification motion, the court's February 1, 2008, order is vacated. Thus, no briefs regarding the timing of a class certification motion are to be filed on February 13, 2008. The court will rule on the pending motions to dismiss as expeditiously as possible. New dates will be in the ruling.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
February 5, 2008 |
Filing 131
MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown: Status hearing held. No later than 7 days following the ruling on the pending motions to dismiss, lead counsel for the parties shall meet to discuss a schedule for discovery and the motion for class certification. No later than 3 business days after that meeting, the parties shall submit the proposed discovery schedule, noting the subjects on which they agree and noting the subjects on which there is a difference. A further status before this Court will be set by an order.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
February 1, 2008 |
Filing 130
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : For the reasons stated below, the court directs the parties to file short position papers as to the timing of the class certification motion. The defendants shall file a joint position paper. The parties position papers shall be no more than 7 pages in length and should be filed no later than Wednesday, February 13, 2008. Mailed notice (rth, )
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 129
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Bryan L Clobes; Order entered granting leave by Judge Blanche M. Manning. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10651468 (mb, )
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 128
NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Foote for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction 122 , motion to supplement 127 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Foote, Robert)
|
January 25, 2008 |
Filing 127
MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 126
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Dominic J. Rizzi (Rizzi, Dominic)
|
January 9, 2008 |
Filing 125
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC by Nyran Rose Pearson (Pearson, Nyran)
|
January 7, 2008 |
Filing 124
MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : Status hearing held and continued to 02/05/08 at 11:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's motion to compel Rule 26 disclosures 121 is stricken without prejudice. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
January 4, 2008 |
Filing 123
NOTICE by Misty Rose Martin of Change of Address (Martin, Misty)
|
January 3, 2008 |
Filing 122
MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Foote, Robert)
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 121
MOTION by Plaintiffs John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Foote, Robert)
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 120
STATUS Report by John B. Sanfilippo & Son, Inc., Blitz Realty Group, Inc., Vincent E Jackson, Vulcan Golf, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Foote, Robert)
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 119
CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. regarding status report 117 , notice of filing 118 (Payne, Alexis)
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 118
NOTICE by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. re status report 117 (Payne, Alexis)
|
January 2, 2008 |
Filing 117
STATUS Report by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. (Payne, Alexis)
|
December 10, 2007 |
Filing 115
MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : The referral of this matter having been assigned to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown, an initial status hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Brown on 01/07/08 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1812. The parties shall deliver a copy of an initial status report providing the information required by Judge Brown's Order Setting Initial Status Report to the Courtroom Deputy (Room 1808) three business days before the initial status hearing. See www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGE BROWN.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
December 7, 2007 |
Filing 116
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to magistrate judge Geraldine Soat Brown for discovery supervision, settlement conference and all nondispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/7/07. (mb, )
|
December 5, 2007 |
Filing 114
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing set for 12/6/2007 is reset to 2/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. Mailed notice (rth, )
|
December 4, 2007 |
Filing 113
Case Management Conference STATEMENT by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Moran, Mariah)
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 112
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 08/21/07; Before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. (ar, )
|
November 20, 2007 |
Filing 111
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing set for 11/29/2007 is reset to 12/6/2007 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 110
REPLY by Internet Reit, Inc. to response to motion, 104 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Borgman, Steven)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 109
REPLY by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to motion to dismiss 98 (Dockterman, Michael)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 108
REPLY by Defendant Google Inc. in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (Moran, Mariah)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 107
REPLY by Defendant Oversee.Net to motion to dismiss 98 (Carter, Janelle)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 106
RESPONSE by Sedo LLCin Support of MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint (Consolidated Motion) 98 (Foukas, Anastasios)
|
November 13, 2007 |
Filing 105
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sedo LLC by Anastasios T. Foukas (Foukas, Anastasios)
|
November 5, 2007 |
Filing 104
RESPONSE by Vulcan Golf, LLC to MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint (Consolidated Motion) 98 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D (1 of 2)# 5 Exhibit D (2 of 2)# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Motion to Amend# 9 Motion for Leave)(Foote, Robert)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 103
MEMORANDUM by Oversee.Net in support of motion to dismiss 98 First Amended Class Action Complaint (Carter, Janelle)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 102
MEMORANDUM by Sedo LLC in support of motion to dismiss 98 (Martin, Misty)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 101
MEMORANDUM motion to dismiss 98 by Google Inc. in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Moran, Mariah)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 100
MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 98 Amended Class Action Complaint (Borgman, Steven)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 99
MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 98 Amended Class Action Complaint (Dockterman, Michael)
|
October 18, 2007 |
Filing 98
MOTION by Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint (Consolidated Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Dockterman, Michael)
|
October 3, 2007 |
Filing 97
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Defendants' motions for leave to file separate motions 93 94 are granted in part and denied in part. The court intended to require the defendants to file a consolidated motion to dismiss to the extent possible and to allow them to file separate supplemental briefs addressing any individual issues. The court regrets any confusion. The defendants seek to file five separate 35-page briefs. Assuming that they use all of these pages, they will file a total of 175 pages which may contain duplicative arguments or factual summaries. The record does not show that this extraordinary number of pages is necessary. Accordingly, the court directs the defendants to file a consolidated brief to the extent possible that contains any common arguments (between all or some of the defendants) as well as a joint summary of relevant facts. Contrary to its statements in open court, they may then file separate briefs addressing individual arguments, not to exceed 20 pages each. If any defendant believes that additional pages are necessary, it must file a motion articulating specific bases for such a request. Mailed notice (rth, )
|
October 1, 2007 |
Filing 96
NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 93 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/4/2007 at 11:00 AM. (Martin, Misty)
|
September 28, 2007 |
Filing 95
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion for leave to file 94 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/4/2007 at 11:00 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
September 28, 2007 |
Filing 94
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file Separate Motion and Supporting Brief to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (Moran, Mariah)
|
September 28, 2007 |
Filing 93
MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLCLeave to File Individual Briefs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Misty)
|
September 28, 2007 |
Filing 92
for Leave NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/4/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Martin, Misty)
|
September 25, 2007 |
Filing 91
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Aaron Daniel Van Oort (Van Oort, Aaron)
|
September 20, 2007 |
Filing 90
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing held and continued to 11/29/2007 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery is stayed until the next status. Rule 26(a)disclosures shall be made by 11/5/2007. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the amendments by 10/18/2007. Defendants oral motion for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages up to 35 pages is granted. Defendants shall file aconsolidated motion to dismiss and reply. Plaintiffs consolidated response to defendants motion to dismiss to be filed by 11/5/2007. Plaintiff granted same page limit for its response. Defendants reply to be filed by 11/13/2007. Mailed notice (mb, )
|
September 18, 2007 |
Filing 89
First AMENDED complaint by Vulcan Golf, LLC against all defendants (Foote, Robert)
|
September 18, 2007 |
Filing 88
ENTERED in error. See number 89. (Foote, Robert). (Text edited by Clerk's Office). Modified on 9/19/2007 (ar, ).
|
September 13, 2007 |
Filing 87
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli (Bulgarelli, Mark)
|
September 11, 2007 |
Filing 86
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Dana Marie Pesha (Pesha, Dana)
|
September 11, 2007 |
Filing 85
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by William J. Harte (Harte, William)
|
September 10, 2007 |
Filing 84
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Status hearing set for 9/20/2007 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
|
August 21, 2007 |
Filing 83
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Blanche M. Manning from Judge Charles P. Kocoras for all further proceedings, pursuant to IOP 13F2, signed by Judge Executive Committee on 08/21/07. (See order for further detail). Mailed notice(ar, )
|
August 21, 2007 |
Filing 82
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Status and motion hearing held on 8/21/2007. Plaintiff is given leave to file an amended complaint on or before 9/18/2007. All pending motions to dismiss 52 58 59 70 75 are denied without prejudice. All pending motions for leave to file in excess of fifteen pages 51 57 are moot. Discovery is stayed until the pleadings are in order. Hearing on defendant Oversee.net's motion 75 to dismiss, set for 8/28/2007, is stricken as moot.Mailed notice (sct, )
|
August 20, 2007 |
Filing 81
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sedo LLC (Martin, Misty)
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 80
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dotster, Inc. by Robert L. Hickok; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10911342 (mb, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 79
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dotster, Inc. by Joanna J. Cline; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10911342 (mb, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 78
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dotster, Inc. by Vincent V. Carissimi; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10911342 (mb, )
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 77
NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion to dismiss 75 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/28/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 76
MEMORANDUM by Oversee.Net in support of motion to dismiss 75 (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 75
MOTION by Defendant Oversee.Net to dismiss (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 17, 2007 |
Filing 74
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Google Inc. (Moran, Mariah)
|
August 16, 2007 |
Filing 73
Defendant Internet Reit, Inc.'s Local Rule 3.2 Statement by Internet Reit, Inc. (Held, Kenneth)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 72
NOTICE of Motion by Michael R. Dockterman for presentment of motion to dismiss 70 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 9:30 AM. (Dockterman, Michael)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 71
MEMORANDUM by Dotster, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 70 Plaintiff's RICO Claims, and other Non-Trademark Related Claims, in the Class Action Complaint (Dockterman, Michael)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 70
MOTION by Defendant Dotster, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff's RICO Claims, and other Non-Trademark Related Claims, in the Class Action Complaint (Dockterman, Michael)
|
August 15, 2007 |
Filing 69
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dotster, Inc. (Dockterman, Michael)
|
August 14, 2007 |
Filing 67
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Oversee.net's agreed motion 64 for leave to file briefs in excess of page limitation is granted. Oversee is given leave to file brief of up to 30 pages in support of its motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is given leave to file a brief of up to 30 pages in response to Oversee's motion to dismiss. Oversee is given leave to file reply brief of up to 15 pages. Hearing on Oversee's motion 64 for leave to file briefs in excess of page limitation, set for 8/15/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
|
August 13, 2007 |
Filing 68
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Oversee.Net by Steven D. Atlee; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10649255 (mb, )
|
August 13, 2007 |
Filing 66
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Dotster, Inc. a/k/a RevenueDirect.com's agreed motion 55 for leave to file oversize brief is granted. Said brief is limited to 25 pages. Hearing on said motion, set for 8/14/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
|
August 13, 2007 |
Filing 65
NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 64 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/15/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 13, 2007 |
Filing 64
MOTION by Defendant Oversee.Net for leave to file excess pages (AGREED) (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 63
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to dismiss 58 , motion for leave to file excess pages 57 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 62
MEMORANDUM by Internet Reit, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 59 (August, Brett)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 61
MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 58 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Moran, Mariah)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 60
NOTICE of Motion by Brett A. August for presentment of motion to dismiss 59 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (August, Brett)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 59
MOTION by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. to dismiss (August, Brett)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 58
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. to dismiss (Moran, Mariah)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 57
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Agreed) (Moran, Mariah)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 56
NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 55 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/14/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 55
MOTION by Defendant Dotster, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Oversized Brief) (Agreed) (Conlon, Alison)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 54
Re- NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of motion to dismiss 52 , motion for leave to file excess pages 51 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Martin, Misty)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 53
NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of motion to dismiss 52 , motion for leave to file excess pages 51 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Martin, Misty)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 52
MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLC to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support)(Martin, Misty)
|
August 10, 2007 |
Filing 51
MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLC for leave to file excess pages (Martin, Misty)
|
August 9, 2007 |
Filing 50
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Motion hearing held on 8/9/2007. Defendant Reit's motion 49 for leave to file brief in excess of page limitation, is granted. Brief is limited to 30 pages. Mailed notice (sct, )
|
August 7, 2007 |
Filing 49
MOTION by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Payne, Alexis)
|
August 7, 2007 |
Filing 48
NOTICE of Motion by Alexis Elizabeth Payne for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/9/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Payne, Alexis)
|
August 7, 2007 |
Filing 47
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Oversee.net's agreed motion 45 for an extension of time to 8/17/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Hearing on said motion, set for 8/9/2007, is stricken. Parties are reminded that the correct case number is 07-cv-3371. Mailed notice (sct, )
|
August 3, 2007 |
Filing 46
NOTICE of Motion by Janelle M. Carter for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 45 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/9/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 3, 2007 |
Filing 45
MOTION by Defendant Oversee.Net for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (AGREED) (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 3, 2007 |
Filing 44
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Janelle M. Carter (Carter, Janelle)
|
August 3, 2007 |
Filing 43
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oversee.Net by Ronald Y Rothstein (Rothstein, Ronald)
|
July 31, 2007 |
Filing 42
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Joseph Gratz (Gratz, Joseph)
|
July 31, 2007 |
Filing 41
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Michael Page (Page, Michael)
|
July 30, 2007 |
Filing 38
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Dotster, Inc. a/k/a RevenueDirect.com's agreed motion 36 for an extension of time to 8/15/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Hearing on said motion, set for 7/31/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 40
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. by Alexis Elizabeth Payne (mb, )
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 39
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. by Bradley Louis Cohn (mb, )
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 37
NOTICE of Motion by Alison C Conlon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 36 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Conlon, Alison)
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 36
MOTION by Defendant Dotster, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Conlon, Alison)
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 35
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dotster, Inc. by Alison C Conlon (Conlon, Alison)
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 34
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dotster, Inc. by Michael R. Dockterman (Dockterman, Michael)
|
July 27, 2007 |
Filing 33
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. by Brett A. August (August, Brett)
|
July 25, 2007 |
Filing 28
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Defendant Google, Inc.'s agreed motion 15 for an extension of time to 8/10/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Defendant Internet Reit, Inc.'s unopposed motion 18 to extend time to 8/10/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Defendant Seco.com's motion 26 for an extension of time to 9/15/2007 to answer or otherwise plead is denied. Seco.com is given to 8/10/2007 to answer or otherwise plead. Hearing on all pending motions, set for 7/31/2007, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, )
|
July 24, 2007 |
Filing 32
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Michael Page; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10723738. (ar, )
|
July 24, 2007 |
Filing 31
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Google Inc. by Joseph Gratz; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10723737. (ar, )
|
July 24, 2007 |
Filing 30
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Internet Reit, Inc. by Kenneth P. Held; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10340330 (Exhibit). (ar, )
|
July 24, 2007 |
Filing 29
APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Internet Reit, Inc. by Steven R. Borgman; Order entered granting leave by Judge Charles P. Kocoras. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10340329. (ar, )
|
July 23, 2007 |
Filing 27
NOTICE of Motion by Misty Rose Martin for presentment of extension of time 26 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Martin, Misty)
|
July 23, 2007 |
Filing 26
MOTION by Defendant Sedo LLC for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Martin, Misty)
|
July 23, 2007 |
Filing 25
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sedo LLC by Misty Rose Martin (Martin, Misty)
|
July 23, 2007 |
Filing 24
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sedo LLC by Jeffrey Singer (Singer, Jeffrey)
|
July 23, 2007 |
Filing 23
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Dotster, Inc. on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. (Foote, Robert)
|
July 20, 2007 |
Filing 22
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Oversee.Net on 7/18/2007, answer due 8/7/2007. (Foote, Robert)
|
July 16, 2007 |
Filing 21
Internet Reit, Inc.'s Amended NOTICE of Motion by Scott Ryan Wiehle for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 18 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Wiehle, Scott)
|
July 13, 2007 |
Filing 17
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of extension of time 15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/31/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
July 12, 2007 |
Filing 20
NOTICE of Motion by Internet Reit, Inc. re Unopposed motion by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc., to respond to plaintifff's complaint 18 (hp, )
|
July 11, 2007 |
Filing 19
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. d/b/a Ireit, Inc., by Scott Ryan Wiehle (hp, )
|
July 11, 2007 |
Filing 18
MOTION by Defendant Internet Reit, Inc. d/b/a Ireit, Inc's unopposed motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's complaint (hp, )
|
July 10, 2007 |
Filing 16
NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of extension of time 15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/17/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
|
July 10, 2007 |
Filing 15
MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Agreed) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Mariah)
|
July 10, 2007 |
Filing 14
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Mariah E Moran (Moran, Mariah)
|
July 10, 2007 |
Filing 13
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Joseph J. Duffy (Duffy, Joseph)
|
July 10, 2007 |
Filing 12
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Jonathan M. Cyrluk (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
|
July 6, 2007 |
Filing 11
MINUTE entry before Judge Charles P. Kocoras :Status hearing set for 8/21/2007 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing.Mailed notice (sct, )
|
July 3, 2007 |
Filing 10
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Sedo LLC on 6/27/2007, answer due 7/17/2007. (Foote, Robert)
|
July 3, 2007 |
Filing 9
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Internet Reit, Inc. on 6/20/2007, answer due 7/10/2007. (Foote, Robert)
|
June 25, 2007 |
Filing 8
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vulcan Golf, LLC as to Google Inc. on 6/20/2007, answer due 7/10/2007. (Foote, Robert)
|
June 19, 2007 |
MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (mb, )
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 7
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Internet Reit, Inc., Google Inc., Oversee.Net, Sedo LLC, Dotster, Inc. (mb, )
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 5
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Kathleen Currie Chavez (mb, )
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 4
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Stephen William Fung (mb, )
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 3
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vulcan Golf, LLC by Robert M. Foote (mb, )
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 2
CIVIL Cover Sheet (mb, )
|
June 15, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT filed by Vulcan Golf, LLC; (Exhibits) Jury Demand.(mb, )
|