Woischke et al v. Monaco Coach Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Robert B. Woischke and IWOI, LLC
Defendant: Monaco Coach Corporation, Beaver Motorcoaches, Barrington Motor Sales RV, Roadmaster Chassis and Caterpillar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv03453
Filed: June 20, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Mark Filip
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 313 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/6/2013: Before the Court are Defendants' Amended Bill of Costs [ 309 -2] and Plaintiff's Response and Objections to Defendants' Amended Bill of Costs [ 312 ]. For the reasons stated below, the Court grants in part Defendants'Amended Bill of Costs [ 309 -2] and awards Defendants $4,263.00 in costs. (For further details see Written Opinion). Mailed notice(et, )
August 28, 2012 303 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/28/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 20, 2012 297 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/20/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
May 24, 2011 242 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 5/24/11: (vkd, )
February 7, 2011 215 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 2/7/2011: Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 2/7/2011: (vkd, )
October 9, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/9/2008:Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woischke et al v. Monaco Coach Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Woischke
Represented By: Brian C. Witter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IWOI, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Witter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monaco Coach Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaver Motorcoaches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Motor Sales RV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadmaster Chassis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?