U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Lake Shore Asset Management Limited
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Lake Shore Asset Management Limited
Case Number: 1:2007cv03598
Filed: June 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Mason
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 901 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/19/2011:Mailed notice(rth, )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 831 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/30/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 770 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/15/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/5/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 597 MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/17/2008:Mailed notice(rth, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Lake Shore Asset Management Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Diane Marie Romaniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Shore Asset Management Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?