Hare v. Custable et al

Plaintiff: Brad L. Hare
Defendant: Frank J Custable, Jr, Institutional Management, Inc., Power Direct, Inc. and New City Sales Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2007cv03742
Filed: July 3, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2011 235 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/20/2011: Plaintiffs motions for preliminary injunction to facilitate sale of real property and for permanent injunction to preserve trust property 206 are respectfully denied without prejudice. On the basis of the current record, thereis too much uncertainty as to, inter alia, (1) whether the offer remains open, (2) if so, whether the offer represents a fair valuation of the asset, and (3) the terms on which any sale might procee d. Nevertheless, the Court remainsof the view that the concept of selling the property for fair market value, with the proceeds to be held in escrow, is worthy of exploration and encourages both parties to revisit the issue in light of current market conditions with an eye toward presenting a renewed motion. Please see below for further explanation. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
December 8, 2010 204 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/8/2010: Plaintiffs motion concerning the terms of communications between Plaintiffs counsel and Defendant Custable 202 is taken under advisement. For the reasons stated below, the Cou rt will defer consideration of the motion until after it has ruled on Defendant Custables motion for appointment of counsel 198 and DefendantCustables motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (with financial affidavit) 199 , both of which pre sent complex issues that the Court is in the process of evaluating. To the extent that the issues raised in Plaintiffsmotion remain live after the ruling on Defendants pending motions, the Court will set a briefing schedule at that time. In the meantime, the notice of motion date of 12/9/2010 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 31, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/31/2009.Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hare v. Custable et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad L. Hare
Represented By: Roger C. Goble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J Custable, Jr
Represented By: Edward J Sedlacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institutional Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New City Sales Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?