WMH Tool Group, Inc. v. Woodstock International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: WMH Tool Group, Inc.
Defendant: Woodstock International, Inc. and Grizzly Industrial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv03885
Filed: July 10, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2009 491 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/9/2009.Mailed notice(vcf, )
July 6, 2009 359 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 7/6/2009.(rbf, )
April 8, 2009 314 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/8/2009.(vcf, )
January 14, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 1/14/2009.(rbf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WMH Tool Group, Inc. v. Woodstock International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WMH Tool Group, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Emmett Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodstock International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grizzly Industrial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?