Morris v. Gordon

Plaintiff: Cherise Morris
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Case Number: 1:2007cv03907
Filed: July 11, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/21/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 17, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Shane Gordon for judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claims (Murray, Daniel) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office.)
April 9, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/9/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 8, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by Judge Milton I. Shadur on 2/8/2008:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherise Morris
Represented By: Gregory E. Kulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?