Johnson v. G.D.F., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert S Johnson
Defendant: G.D.F., Inc. and Gregory D. Fischer
Case Number: 1:2007cv03996
Filed: July 17, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 270 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 2/5/2014. Mailed notice (ber, )
March 25, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/25/2011. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 3, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED RENEWED MOTION by Defendant G.D.F., Inc. for judgment as a matter of law -- (Rothschild, Donald) (Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/4/2009) (hp, ).
September 12, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/12/2008:Mailed notice(cjg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. G.D.F., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S Johnson
Represented By: Ernest Thomas Rossiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.D.F., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory D. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?