Bilek et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.

Plaintiff: Christopher Bilek and Mary Bilek
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv04147
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Referring Judge: Geraldine Soat Brown
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2011 209 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/3/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 21, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/21/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 19, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/19/2010: The Court, in its discretion, denies Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration 134 . Plaintiffs' response to AHMSI's fee petition is due on or before 8/23/10. No appearance is required on the 8/26/10 notice date. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 10, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2010: The Court denies American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.'s motion to establish an escrow account 101 . [For further detail see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 9, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/9/2010: The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion to take an additional Rule 30(b)(6) deposition 118 , but declines to order BOA to pay the costs for this additional deposition. This additi onal Rule 30(b)(6) deposition must take place by no later than 8/30/10. Dispositive motions with supporting memorandum are due by no later than 9/30/10. Status hearing set for 8/19/10 is stricken and reset to 10/5/10 at 8:30 a.m. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
July 15, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/15/2010: Bank of America's motion to dismiss 51 is denied. Bank of America must answer the complaint on or before 7/30/10. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilek et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bilek
Represented By: Keith James Keogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bilek
Represented By: Keith James Keogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?