Porter v. Evanston Northwestern Healthcare Corporation

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Porter
Defendant: Evanston Northwestern Healthcare Corporation
Case Number: 1:2007cv04446
Filed: August 7, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2016 842 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Opinion, Defendant NorthShores motion for summary judgment based on the statute of limitations 773 is denied in large part and granted to the limited extent explained in the Opinion. Emailed notice(slb, )
December 10, 2013 587 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Opinion, Plaintiffs' motion to certify the class 478 is granted. Status hearing of 12/16/2013 remains as scheduled. Mailed notice(slb, )
April 12, 2010 393 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order (Redacted) Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 4/12/2010:Mailed notice(mad, )
November 26, 2008 227 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Morton Denlow on 11/26/2008:Mailed notice(dmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Evanston Northwestern Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Porter
Represented By: Mary Jane Fait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Northwestern Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?