Jones v. Clark et al

Plaintiff: Christina Jones
Defendant: Craig Clark, Donn Kaminski and City of Braidwood
Case Number: 1:2007cv04612
Filed: August 15, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 10/3/2011: Plaintiff's bill of costs 126 is granted in part. Plaintiff is awarded $3,230.03 in costs. SEE MINUTE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 10/3/2011.Mailed notice(air, )
August 12, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants City of Braidwood, Craig Clark, Donn Kaminski for judgment as a Matter of Law or Alternatively to Vacate Judgment Entered on Jury Verdict and for New Trial (Barasha, William)
September 21, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 9/21/2009.Mailed notice(tlp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Jones
Represented By: Edward M. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donn Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Braidwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?