Fuery et al v. City Of Chicago et al

Plaintiff: Kelly Fuery, Debra Sciortino and Nicole Tomaskovic
Defendant: City Of Chicago, William Szura, Sergeant Misloslavich and State Trooper Aragones
Case Number: 1:2007cv05428
Filed: September 26, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: William J. Hibbler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 488 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/29/2016:Mailed notice(rj, )
February 17, 2015 341 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion to reconsider bifurcation of discovery and trial 300 is denied. The parties' motions in limine [281, 283, 284, 285, 286, 287, 288, 289, 290, 291, 292, 293, 294, 295, 296, 297, 298, 301, 302, 303, 30 4, 305, 306] are denied without prejudice to refiling in accordance with this Court's procedures for pretrial orders and motions. A date for the filing of a revised pretrial order will be set if settlement is not successful. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/17/2015. Mailed notice(rj, )
March 25, 2014 277 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/25/2014. Mailed notice (jdh)
May 6, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 5/6/2009.(kj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuery et al v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Fuery
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Sciortino
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Tomaskovic
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Szura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Misloslavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Trooper Aragones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?