Cantleberry v. Physician Care Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Paul S. Cantleberry
Defendant: Physician Care Ltd and Alexander Nichols
Case Number: 1:2007cv05695
Filed: October 9, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/31/2009.Mailed notice(vcf, )
April 8, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 4/8/2009.(vcf, )
December 18, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 12/18/2008.(vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantleberry v. Physician Care Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul S. Cantleberry
Represented By: Burton A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Care Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?