Del Monte Fresh Produce, N.A., Inc. v. Chiquita Brands International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Del Monte Fresh Produce, N.A., Inc.
Defendant: Chiquita Brands International, Inc. and Kim Kinnavy
Case Number: 1:2007cv05902
Filed: October 18, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: William J. Hibbler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2010 361 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 3/22/2010.(mjc, )
May 13, 2009 248 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 5/13/2009.(mjc, )
March 19, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 3/19/2009.(mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Monte Fresh Produce, N.A., Inc. v. Chiquita Brands International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Monte Fresh Produce, N.A., Inc.
Represented By: Martin K. Denis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brands International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Kinnavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?