Schaaf v. Midwest Transfer & Logistics, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lyle Vander Schaaf
Defendant: Midwest Transfer & Logistics, LLC and Mark Rhodes
Case Number: 1:2007cv06555
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: James B. Moran
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/5/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
July 20, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court The defendants' motion to reconsider 114 is denied. The pretrial conference is reset to 8/5/2010 at 12:00 p.m. Briefing on the motions in limine shall proceed as follows: responses shall be filed by 7/26/2010 and replies shall be filed by 7/29/2010. No extensions of this schedule will be granted. WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/20/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
July 8, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/8/2010:Mailed notice(slb, )
November 6, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/6/2009:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaaf v. Midwest Transfer & Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Vander Schaaf
Represented By: Francis Peter Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Transfer & Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?