Huss v. IBM Medical and Dental Plan et al

Plaintiff: Eileen Huss
Defendant: IBM Medical and Dental Plan and R.A. Barnes
Case Number: 1:2007cv07028
Filed: December 14, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 7/15/2010.Mailed notice(drw, )
November 4, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 11/4/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )
March 20, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 3/20/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huss v. IBM Medical and Dental Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Huss
Represented By: Paul F. Heaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Medical and Dental Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?