MacNeil Automotive Products Limited v. Cannon Automotive Limited

Plaintiff: MacNeil Automotive Products Limited
Defendant: Cannon Automotive Limited
Case Number: 1:2008cv00139
Filed: January 8, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2014 581 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/11/2014. Mailed notice(ef, )
November 28, 2012 463 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/28/2012: Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims 414 is granted. Plaintiff is directed to answer the amended counterclaim by 12/20/2012. Mailed notice (tlm)
October 26, 2012 446 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/26/2012. Mailed notice (tlm)
September 22, 2011 321 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/22/2011. Mailed notice (tlm)
March 1, 2011 254 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/1/2011:Mailed notice(rj, )
November 23, 2010 232 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/30/2010: Cannon's Objection to Magistrate Judge Keys' Report and Recommendation of 9/01/2010 is overruled. 209 Plaintiff's motion to strike Cannon's "Objections" and its Response Thereto 210 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (tlm)
November 19, 2010 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/19/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
May 25, 2010 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 5/26/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
January 8, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/8/2009. Mailed notice (tlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacNeil Automotive Products Limited v. Cannon Automotive Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacNeil Automotive Products Limited
Represented By: Timothy M Schaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannon Automotive Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?