Bethlehem Enterprise Inc. et al v. City of Oak Forest et al

Plaintiff: Bethlehem Enterprise Inc. and Parvati Corp.
Defendant: City of Oak Forest, Steve Jones, Adam Dotson and David Newquist
Case Number: 1:2008cv00702
Filed: January 31, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 457 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 3/20/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 18, 2010 289 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/18/2010: The Court, in its discretion, grants the second part of the individual Defendants' motion to quash the subpoena directed at the law firm Ancel Glink. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
November 16, 2010 288 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/16/2010: The Court, in its discretion, grants Defendants' Corrected Motion to Quash Subpoena directed to the law firm Dowd & Dowd, Ltd. 235 in its entirety. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
November 1, 2010 275 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/1/2010: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendant's motion for leave to file a Second Additional Affirmative Defense 256 . Defendants must file their Second Additional Affirmative Defense in accordance with this order by no later than 11/5/10. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
October 18, 2010 253 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/18/2010: The Court grants in part Defendants' motion to quash 219 with respect to deposing a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) deponent representing Ancel Glink. The Court, however, directs Defendants to file a reply brief providing the necessary information required to assert the attorney-client, common interest, or work product privileges with respect to the documents requested. Finally, Defendants must also address Plaintiff's argument concerning the crime-fraud exception as it relates to the documents requested. Defendants' reply brief is due on or before 10/25/10. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 23, 2010 214 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/23/2010: The Court, in its discretion, grants Plaintiff's motion to compel 187 . Defendants must produce the requested documents, affidavits of completeness, and/or appropriate privilege logs by no later than 9/1/10. The Court denies Plaintiff's request for fees. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
July 19, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/19/2010: The Court grants Plaintiffs' first and second motions to compel 179 181 in their entirety. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethlehem Enterprise Inc. et al v. City of Oak Forest et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethlehem Enterprise Inc.
Represented By: John R. Wimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parvati Corp.
Represented By: John R. Wimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oak Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Newquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?