Bone Care International LLC et al v. Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bone Care International LLC and Genzyme Corporation
Defendant: Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01083
Filed: February 21, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 653 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Cobrek Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Counter Claimants Cobrek Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for judgment to be Entered (Stevenson, Robert)
March 29, 2012 651 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/29/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
March 22, 2012 649 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/22/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
March 30, 2011 643 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/30/2011: Before the Court are Defendants Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Cobrek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s (collectively, Defendants) motion for summary judgment 473 of invalidity of cl aim 7 of U.S. Patent No. 5,602,116 (the 116 patent) for lack of enablement and lack of written description, and Plaintiffs Bone Care International, LLC and Genzyme Corporations (collectively, Plaintiffs) cross-motion for summary judgment 492 that the 116 paten is enabled as of the filing date of its parent patent application. For the reasons below, the Court denies both motions [473, 492]. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
October 19, 2010 546 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/19/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
October 6, 2010 528 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/6/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
October 4, 2010 524 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/4/2010: This minute order is issued to clarify a matter raised at this mornings status hearing concerning the scope of the Courts in limine rulings on Plaintiffs motion to preclude testi mony regarding certain invalidity defenses (Plaintiffs fourth motion in limine 409 ) and Defendants motion to preclude Plaintiffs from presentingevidence that purports to show entitlement to a claim of priority under 35 U.S.C. § 112 399 ). Mailed notice(tbk, )
October 1, 2010 521 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/1/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 30, 2010 518 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/30/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 17, 2010 498 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/17/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
July 30, 2010 468 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/30/2010.(lcw, )
July 16, 2010 447 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 7/16/2010:Mailed notice(tlp, )
June 4, 2010 363 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/4/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
April 23, 2010 327 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/23/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
February 4, 2010 306 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 2/4/2010. (gmr, )
February 2, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/2/2009.Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bone Care International LLC et al v. Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bone Care International LLC
Represented By: Sarah R. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genzyme Corporation
Represented By: Sarah R. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentech Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?