Garvey v. Piper Rudnick LLP Long Term Disability Insurance Plan et al

Plaintiff: J. Kevin Garvey
Defendant: Piper Rudnick LLP Long Term Disability Insurance Plan and Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv01093
Filed: February 20, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 193 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/30/2012.Mailed notice.(jlj)
March 25, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/25/2011.Mailed notice.(jlj)
December 8, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 12/8/2009.Mailed notice(lxs, )
October 9, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 10/9/2009.Mailed notice(lxs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garvey v. Piper Rudnick LLP Long Term Disability Insurance Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Kevin Garvey
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Rudnick LLP Long Term Disability Insurance Plan
Represented By: W. Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?