Saso Golf, Inc. v. Nike, Inc.

Plaintiff: Saso Golf, Inc.
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01110
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the opinion, the cross-motions to clarify [123, 124] are granted. Position papers on the remaining construction issue, as explained in the opinion, are due as follows: Saso's position paper is due on 09/23/2013; Nike's response is due on 10/14/2013; Saso may reply on 10/21/2013. Status hearing of 10/23/2013 is reset to 11/06/2013 at 9 a.m. Mailed notice(slb, )
November 1, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/1/2010:Mailed notice(wp, )
October 5, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 10/5/2009.Mailed notice(lxs, )
April 6, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 4/6/2009.(kjd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saso Golf, Inc. v. Nike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saso Golf, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Ryndak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?