Wielgus v. Ryobi Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jaroslaw Wielgus
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01597
Filed: March 19, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: George W. Lindberg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2012 271 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/23/2012. (ma,)
August 21, 2012 268 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/21/2012. (ma,)
July 23, 2012 263 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/23/2012. (ma,)
July 17, 2012 261 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/17/2012. (ma,)
June 21, 2012 259 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 6/21/2012. (ma,)
June 18, 2012 257 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 6/18/2012. (ma,)
May 22, 2012 254 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/22/2012: Jury trial set for October 15, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (aac, )
May 21, 2012 251 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/21/2012. (aac, )
May 16, 2012 248 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/16/2012. (aac, )
April 18, 2012 242 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 4/18/2012. (aac, )
December 10, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 12/10/2010. (aac, )
August 4, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 8/4/2010. (aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wielgus v. Ryobi Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaroslaw Wielgus
Represented By: F. John Cushing, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?