Heriot et al v. Byrne et al

Plaintiff: Drew Heriot and Drew Pictures Pty LTD
Defendant: Rhonda Byrne, Secret LLC, The, Prime Time US Inc., TS Production Holdings LLC, TS Productions LLC, TS Merchandising Ltd. and Robert E. Rainone, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02272
Filed: April 21, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Suzanne B. Conlon
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2009 341 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants TS Productions LLC, TS Merchandising Ltd., Rhonda Byrne, Prime Time US Inc., TS Production Holdings LLC, Counter Claimant TS Productions LLC for judgment Defendants' Memorandum In Support Of Oral Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law (Davis-Denny, Grant)
April 9, 2009 301 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 4/9/2009:(gcy, )
March 20, 2009 286 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 3/20/2009:(gcy, )
December 23, 2008 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 12/23/2008:Mailed notice(tlp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heriot et al v. Byrne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Heriot
Represented By: Paul L. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Pictures Pty LTD
Represented By: Paul L. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secret LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Time US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Production Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Productions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Merchandising Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Rainone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?