BBC Chartering & Logistics GmbH & Co. K.G. v. Rotec Industries Inc.

Plaintiff: BBC Chartering & Logistics GmbH & Co. K.G.
Defendant: Rotec Industries Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02279
Filed: April 22, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 2/23/2011.Mailed notice(drw, )
January 6, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Mailed notice(drw, )
November 15, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 11/15/2010.Mailed notice(drw, )
January 23, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 1/23/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBC Chartering & Logistics GmbH & Co. K.G. v. Rotec Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBC Chartering & Logistics GmbH & Co. K.G.
Represented By: Stephen James Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rotec Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?