Greenleaf Limited Partnership v. Illinois Housing Development Authority

Plaintiff: Greenleaf Limited Partnership
Defendant: Illinois Housing Development Authority
Case Number: 1:2008cv02480
Filed: April 30, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 215 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, HUD's motion for partial summary judgment 163 is granted. HUD is not required to indemnify IHDA for its costs or expenses incurred in the present litigation. IHDAs motion for summary judgment 178 and HUDs motion for partial summary judgment 184 are granted in part and denied in part. The Court declares that HUD must fund rent increases for which IHDA is liable under the Greenleaf HAP, up to the total expense limitation contained in the Greenleaf ACC. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/9/2015.Mailed notice(tsa, )
September 6, 2013 151 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, HUDs Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to dismiss Count I of the Amended Third Party Complaints is granted and Count I is dismissed. The motion to dismiss the indemnification portion of Count II of the Amended Third Party Complaints is denied without prejudice. The motion to dismiss the Count III of the Amended Third Party Complaints is grant in part and denied in part; Count III may proceed with respect to the ACCs governing Greenleaf and Sandberg only. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/6/2013.Mailed notice(tsa, )
December 10, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court Motion for partial summary judgment 93 is granted; WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/10/2010.(tsa, )
September 30, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/30/2010.(tsa, )
December 23, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/23/2009:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 23, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/23/2009:Mailed notice(jms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenleaf Limited Partnership v. Illinois Housing Development Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenleaf Limited Partnership
Represented By: Richard Alan Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Housing Development Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?