Stereo Optical Co., Inc, v. Judy et al

Plaintiff: Stereo Optical Co., Inc,
Defendant: Thomas J. Judy, Jacqueline K. Judy, Ralph E. Craig, Richard J. Unger and Vision Assessment Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv02512
Filed: May 2, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2010 238 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/1/2010.Mailed notice(sct, )
May 14, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 5/14/2009:Mailed notice(wyh, )
September 8, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/8/2008.Mailed notice(sct, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stereo Optical Co., Inc, v. Judy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stereo Optical Co., Inc,
Represented By: Grant Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Judy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline K. Judy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph E. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Assessment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?